This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/13/2023 at 09:11:43 (UTC).

CONN, DIANE MARGARET - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 01/27/2022 CONN, DIANE MARGARET - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTIAN, DEBORAH L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0817

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTIAN, DEBORAH L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CONNLEMOS DONNA M.

Claimants

AMERICAN EXPRESS

DELL FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC SERVICER FOR WEBBANK

Decedent

CONN DIANE MARGARET

Not Classified By Court

LEMOS LARRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ANDERSON JOHN T. ESQ

 

Court Documents

Receipt - Receipt - Jeffrey M. Conn

4/5/2023: Receipt - Receipt - Jeffrey M. Conn

Receipt - Receipt - Brian L. Conn

4/5/2023: Receipt - Receipt - Brian L. Conn

Ex Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order

4/5/2023: Ex Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order

Receipt - Receipt - Donna M ConnLemos

4/5/2023: Receipt - Receipt - Donna M ConnLemos

Order - Final Distribution

2/15/2023: Order - Final Distribution

Minute Order

1/17/2023: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing: First and Final Account and Report

11/7/2022: Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing: First and Final Account and Report

Account - Final or Waiver

11/1/2022: Account - Final or Waiver

Withdrawal - Creditor's Claim - Withdrawal of Creditor's Claim - American Express

11/1/2022: Withdrawal - Creditor's Claim - Withdrawal of Creditor's Claim - American Express

Withdrawal - Creditor's Claim - Withdrawal of Creditor's Claim - Dell Financial / WebBank

11/1/2022: Withdrawal - Creditor's Claim - Withdrawal of Creditor's Claim - Dell Financial / WebBank

Miscellaneous Document - FTB Clearance Letter

11/1/2022: Miscellaneous Document - FTB Clearance Letter

Notice - Administration to Creditors - Notice - Administration to Creditors

11/1/2022: Notice - Administration to Creditors - Notice - Administration to Creditors

Withdrawal - Creditor's Claim - Withdrawal of Creditor's Claim - Larry Lemos

11/1/2022: Withdrawal - Creditor's Claim - Withdrawal of Creditor's Claim - Larry Lemos

Miscellaneous Document - Miscellaneous Document: Cal Victims Comp Clearance

9/22/2022: Miscellaneous Document - Miscellaneous Document: Cal Victims Comp Clearance

Inventory & Appraisal - (Final)

9/22/2022: Inventory & Appraisal - (Final)

Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim (Pay to Others) - Allowance of $ 837.85 for Dell Financial

9/22/2022: Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim (Pay to Others) - Allowance of $ 837.85 for Dell Financial

Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim (Pay to Others) - Allowance of $14,243.27 to American Express

9/22/2022: Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim (Pay to Others) - Allowance of $14,243.27 to American Express

Miscellaneous Document - Miscellaneous Document: Department of Health Care Services Clearance

9/22/2022: Miscellaneous Document - Miscellaneous Document: Department of Health Care Services Clearance

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketReceipt (Receipt - Jeffrey M. Conn ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketReceipt (Receipt - Brian L. Conn ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketReceipt (Receipt - Donna M ConnLemos ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketEx Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketOrder - Final Distribution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • Docketin Probate Department 44, Christian, Deborah L., Presiding; Accounting Hearing - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketPetition Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketNotice - Hearing (Notice of Hearing: First and Final Account and Report ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketWithdrawal - Creditor's Claim (Withdrawal of Creditor's Claim - Dell Financial / WebBank ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 44, Christian, Deborah L., Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketPetition Granted (Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial) filed on January 27, 2022 by Donna M. Connlemos. )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketProof of Publication; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities - Personal Representative; Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less