Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/02/2021 at 07:53:39 (UTC).

CONEJO VALLEY MOLD, INC. VS JEREMY D. SINGER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/18/2021 CONEJO VALLEY MOLD, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JEREMY D SINGER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0376

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CONEJO VALLEY MOLD INC. DBA CONEJO RESTORATION

Defendants

SINGER JENNIFER A.

SINGER JEREMY D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RODGERS RICHARD A.

Defendant Attorneys

STONE JASON MICHAEL

WRIGHT JESSICA CANDACE

 

Court Documents

Answer

3/29/2021: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER VENTURA COUNTY 10/05/2020

3/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER VENTURA COUNTY 10/05/2020

Substitution of Attorney

3/18/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Proof of Personal Service

3/18/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

3/18/2021: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING AND APPLICATION TO RECONSIDER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

3/18/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING AND APPLICATION TO RECONSIDER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

Notice of Motion - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE TO APPROPRIATE COURT

3/18/2021: Notice of Motion - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE TO APPROPRIATE COURT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER VENTURA COUNTY 10/05/2020

3/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER VENTURA COUNTY 10/05/2020

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ALLOW DEFENDANTS TO FILE AN AMENDED ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT AND A CROSS-COMPLAINT

3/18/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ALLOW DEFENDANTS TO FILE AN AMENDED ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT AND A CROSS-COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/18/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration - DECLARATION OF RICHARD A. RODGERS

3/18/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF RICHARD A. RODGERS

Declaration - DECLARATION OF RICHARD A RODGERS IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

3/18/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF RICHARD A RODGERS IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SCOTT MINEO IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

3/18/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SCOTT MINEO IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Reply - PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO APPLICATION TO RECONSIDER

3/18/2021: Reply - PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO APPLICATION TO RECONSIDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER VENTURA COUNTY 02/26/21

3/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER VENTURA COUNTY 02/26/21

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER VENTURA COUNTY 01/27/21

3/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER VENTURA COUNTY 01/27/21

Judgment

3/18/2021: Judgment

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF INCOMING TRANSFER]

3/23/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF INCOMING TRANSFER]

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2021
  • Hearing05/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department T at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Conejo Valley Mold, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Incoming Transfer]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case (Ventura County); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketOther - (Case Summary - Ventura County); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Conejo Valley Mold, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Conejo Valley Mold, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Ventura County 02/26/21); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketOrder (Transferring Case to Appropriate Court); Filed by Jeremy D. Singer (Defendant); Jennifer A. Singer (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Transfer Out); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketClerk's Certificate and Receipt for Transfer of Records; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Conejo Valley Mold, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Incoming Transfer; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketTransfer In Case Documents; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Conejo Valley Mold, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Conejo Valley Mold, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONEJO VALLEY MOLD INC. DBA CONEJO RESTORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STONE JASON M.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WRIGHT JESSICA C.