This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2019 at 02:49:04 (UTC).

COMPASS CHASSIS POOL, INC. VS 3T HOLDING, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/07/2018 COMPASS CHASSIS POOL, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 3T HOLDING, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAURICE A. LEITER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0072

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAURICE A. LEITER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COMPASS CHASSIS POOL INC.

Defendants

3T HOLDING INC.

TANG HAIYAN AKA TINA TANG

WINSFARGO TRANSPORT INC.

WANG GUOXIANG

LIU TOMMY

WINSTAK GROUP INC. DOE 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOODMAN HOWARD

Defendant Attorney

CHU ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

Order - ORDER FOR CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL WITH COURT TO RETAIN JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6

10/4/2019: Order - ORDER FOR CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL WITH COURT TO RETAIN JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6

Request - REQUEST FOR CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL WITH COURT TO RETAIN JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6

8/29/2019: Request - REQUEST FOR CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL WITH COURT TO RETAIN JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6

Notice of Settlement

8/23/2019: Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

8/23/2019: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

5/23/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ANTHONY K. CHU IN RESPONSE TO APRIL 26, 2019 OSC RE: SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR

4/22/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ANTHONY K. CHU IN RESPONSE TO APRIL 26, 2019 OSC RE: SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR

Case Management Statement

4/25/2019: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL...)

4/26/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL...)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUED CMC AND OSC RE SANCTIONS

4/11/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUED CMC AND OSC RE SANCTIONS

Case Management Statement

4/2/2019: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/4/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/4/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

3/4/2019: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Answer

3/15/2019: Answer

Case Management Statement

3/22/2019: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/27/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/7/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/7/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketOrder (for Conditional Dismissal With Court to Retain Jurisdiction Pursuant to CCP 664.6); Filed by Compass Chassis Pool, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketRequest ( for Conditional Dismissal With Court to Retain Jurisdiction Pursuant to CCP 664.6); Filed by Compass Chassis Pool, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Compass Chassis Pool, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Compass Chassis Pool, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Sanctions Against Defense Counsel for Failure to Appear on 3/27/19) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal for Failure to Prosecute) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Compass Chassis Pool, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Compass Chassis Pool, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Compass Chassis Pool, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Compass Chassis Pool, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by Compass Chassis Pool, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Compass Chassis Pool, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Compass Chassis Pool, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Compass Chassis Pool, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 3T HOLDING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where WINSFARGO TRANSPORT INC is a litigant

Latest cases where COMPASS CHASSIS POOL INC. is a litigant