This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/05/2017 at 14:43:02 (UTC).

COMMUNITY FAMILY CARE MEDICAL GROUP INC VS ROY MEDICAL INC

Case Summary

On 08/04/2017 COMMUNITY FAMILY CARE MEDICAL GROUP INC filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against ROY MEDICAL INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM F. FAHEY and RICHARD E. RICO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0893

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

RICHARD E. RICO

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

COMMUNITY FAMILY CARE MEDICAL GROUP INC

Defendants and Respondents

MENZER LAWRENCE M.D.

ROY MEDICAL GROUP INC

REGAL MEDICAL GROUP INC

SIERRA MEDICAL GROUP INC

A MEDICAL GROUP INC

HERITAGE PROVIDER NETWORK INC

LAKESIDE MEDICAL ORGANIZATION

DOES 1 TO 100

TAMASHIRO VICTOR M.D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

STEINBERG CRAIG S. O.D.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

AMIR MICHAEL M. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

10/18/2017: Minute Order

STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT PENDING AMENDMENT OF COMPLAINT IN RELATED CASE TO ENCOMPASS THIS ACTION

10/18/2017: STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT PENDING AMENDMENT OF COMPLAINT IN RELATED CASE TO ENCOMPASS THIS ACTION

Minute Order

10/20/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER REGARDING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND THE TIME FOR DEFENDANTS LAKESIDE MEDICAL ORGANIZATION, SIERRA MEDICAL GROUP, INC., REGAL MEDICAL GROUP, INC., AND HERITAGE PROVIDER NETWO

10/25/2017: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER REGARDING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND THE TIME FOR DEFENDANTS LAKESIDE MEDICAL ORGANIZATION, SIERRA MEDICAL GROUP, INC., REGAL MEDICAL GROUP, INC., AND HERITAGE PROVIDER NETWO

Minute Order

10/3/2017: Minute Order

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT BY COMMUNITY FAMILY CARE MEDICAL GROUP IPA, INC., FOR: 1. BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT; ETC.

9/25/2017: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT BY COMMUNITY FAMILY CARE MEDICAL GROUP IPA, INC., FOR: 1. BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT; ETC.

Unknown

9/7/2017: Unknown

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

9/11/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

9/11/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

9/11/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

9/11/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

9/11/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

9/11/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

9/11/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

9/13/2017: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

9/13/2017: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

SUMMONS

8/4/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT BY COMMUNITY FAMILY CARE MEDICAL GROUP IPA, INC., FOR: 1. BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT ;ETC

8/4/2017: COMPLAINT BY COMMUNITY FAMILY CARE MEDICAL GROUP IPA, INC., FOR: 1. BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT ;ETC

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2017
  • Notice (OF ENTRY OF ORDER ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT PENDING AMENDMENT OF COMPLAINT IN RELATED CASE TO ENCOMPASS THIS ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • Stipulation and Order (STIPULATON AND ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT PENDING DETERMINATION OF CONSOLIDATION AND COMPLEX DESIGNATION ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • Miscellaneous-Other (CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons (FILED X6 SERV. LAWRENCE MENZER M.D. SERV.ROSALINDA ROY M.D. SERV. VICTOR TAMASHIRO M.D. ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • Notice-Related Cases Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A MEDICAL GROUP INC is a litigant

Latest cases where ROY MEDICAL GROUP INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Sierra Medical Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where COMMUNITY FAMILY CARE MEDICAL GROUP IPA INC. is a litigant