This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/02/2022 at 06:29:13 (UTC).

COMMON SPIRIT HEALTH, ET AL. VS LOCAL INITIATIVE HEALTH AUTHORITY FOR LOS ANGELES COUNTY

Case Summary

On 11/07/2022 COMMON SPIRIT HEALTH, filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LOCAL INITIATIVE HEALTH AUTHORITY FOR LOS ANGELES COUNTY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5341

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COMMON SPIRIT HEALTH

DIGNITY COMMUNITY CARE A COLORADO NONPROFIT CORPORATION DBA CALIFORNIA HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER

DIGNITY HEALTH A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT PUBLIC BENEFIT CORPORATION DBA ST. MARY MEDICAL CENTER

GLENDALE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL AND HEALTH CENTER

NORTHRIDGE HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER

Defendant

LOCAL INITIATIVE HEALTH AUTHORITY FOR LOS ANGELES COUNTY DBA L.A. CARE HEALTH PLAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BUCK JONATHAN F.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/7/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/7/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/7/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/7/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

11/7/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

11/7/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

11/7/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

11/9/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/9/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

11/30/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Proof of Personal Service

11/30/2022: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2023
  • Hearing02/14/2023 at 10:15 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • Hearing01/13/2023 at 10:15 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by: DIGNITY HEALTH, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT PUBLIC BENEFIT CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: LOCAL INITIATIVE HEALTH AUTHORITY FOR LOS ANGELES COUNTY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: DIGNITY HEALTH, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT PUBLIC BENEFIT CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: LOCAL INITIATIVE HEALTH AUTHORITY FOR LOS ANGELES COUNTY (Defendant); Service Date: 11/10/2022; Service Cost: 38.25; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/14/2023 at 10:15 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Jonathan F. Buck (Attorney): Organization Name changed from POLSINELLI LLP to Polsinelli LLP; Middle Name: F.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketAddress for Jonathan F. Buck (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/13/2023 at 10:15 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael L. Stern in Department 62 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: COMMON SPIRIT HEALTH (Plaintiff); DIGNITY COMMUNITY CARE, A COLORADO NONPROFIT CORPORATION (Plaintiff); GLENDALE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL AND HEALTH CENTER (Plaintiff); NORTHRIDGE HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER (Plaintiff); DIGNITY HEALTH, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT PUBLIC BENEFIT CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: LOCAL INITIATIVE HEALTH AUTHORITY FOR LOS ANGELES COUNTY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: COMMON SPIRIT HEALTH (Plaintiff); DIGNITY COMMUNITY CARE, A COLORADO NONPROFIT CORPORATION (Plaintiff); GLENDALE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL AND HEALTH CENTER (Plaintiff); NORTHRIDGE HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER (Plaintiff); DIGNITY HEALTH, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT PUBLIC BENEFIT CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: LOCAL INITIATIVE HEALTH AUTHORITY FOR LOS ANGELES COUNTY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: COMMON SPIRIT HEALTH (Plaintiff); DIGNITY COMMUNITY CARE, A COLORADO NONPROFIT CORPORATION (Plaintiff); GLENDALE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL AND HEALTH CENTER (Plaintiff); NORTHRIDGE HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER (Plaintiff); DIGNITY HEALTH, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT PUBLIC BENEFIT CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: LOCAL INITIATIVE HEALTH AUTHORITY FOR LOS ANGELES COUNTY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DIGNITY COMMUNITY CARE is a litigant

Latest cases where GLENDALE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL AND HEALTH is a litigant

Latest cases where NORTHRIDGE HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where DIGNITY HEALTH DBA NORTHRIDGE HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant