This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/12/2020 at 14:01:41 (UTC).

COMMERCE ESCROW COMPANY VS B. & W. TILE CO., INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/03/2019 COMMERCE ESCROW COMPANY filed an Other lawsuit against B W TILE CO , INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9237

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COMMERCE ESCROW COMPANY

Defendants

B. & W. TILE CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SMITH STEPHANIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARBLE KAREN

Defendant Attorneys

WASSERMAN BRETT J.

YOUNG CLARISSE WAI JHUN

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISCHARGE

2/21/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISCHARGE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT)

2/21/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT)

Proof of Publication

2/20/2020: Proof of Publication

Order for Publication - ORDER FOR PUBLICATION FOR STEPHANIE

1/13/2020: Order for Publication - ORDER FOR PUBLICATION FOR STEPHANIE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (ALL-PURPOSE))

12/20/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (ALL-PURPOSE))

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDERS AT ALL PURPOSE STATUS CONFERENCE

1/3/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDERS AT ALL PURPOSE STATUS CONFERENCE

Application for Publication

12/11/2019: Application for Publication

Status Report - STATUS REPORT DEFENDANT B. & W. TILE CO., INC.S ALL PURPOSE STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT AND REQUEST FOR RELEASE OF INTERPLEADED FUNDS

12/13/2019: Status Report - STATUS REPORT DEFENDANT B. & W. TILE CO., INC.S ALL PURPOSE STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT AND REQUEST FOR RELEASE OF INTERPLEADED FUNDS

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE (CASE NOS. 18STCV05197 ...) OF 11/06/2019

11/6/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE (CASE NOS. 18STCV05197 ...) OF 11/06/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE (CASE NOS. 18STCV05197 ...)

11/6/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE (CASE NOS. 18STCV05197 ...)

Notice - NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF RELATED CASE; NOTICE OF ALL PURPOSE STATUS CONFERENCE

11/13/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF RELATED CASE; NOTICE OF ALL PURPOSE STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice - NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF RELATED CASE; NOTICE OF VACATED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/14/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF RELATED CASE; NOTICE OF VACATED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice - NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF RELATED CASE; NOTICE OF VACATED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/18/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF RELATED CASE; NOTICE OF VACATED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Related Case

10/9/2019: Notice of Related Case

Notice of Related Case

10/9/2019: Notice of Related Case

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/2/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

9/13/2019: Case Management Statement

Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing - NOTICE OF REJECTION - EX PARTE APPLICATION WITHOUT HEARING FOR PUBLICATION RE: STEPHANIE

9/16/2019: Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing - NOTICE OF REJECTION - EX PARTE APPLICATION WITHOUT HEARING FOR PUBLICATION RE: STEPHANIE

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Order to Show Cause Re: (Entry of Judgment) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (stipulation and Order for Discharge); Filed by COMMERCE ESCROW COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Publication; Filed by COMMERCE ESCROW COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketOrder for Publication (for Stephanie); Filed by COMMERCE ESCROW COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Orders At All Purpose Status Conference); Filed by B. & W. Tile Co., Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Status Conference ((All-Purpose)) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose))); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketStatus Report (DEFENDANT B. & W. TILE CO., INC.?S ALL PURPOSE STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT AND REQUEST FOR RELEASE OF INTERPLEADED FUNDS); Filed by B. & W. Tile Co., Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketApplication for Publication (for Stephanie); Filed by COMMERCE ESCROW COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketOrder ({Proposed} to Deposit Interpleaded Funds with Clerk of Court); Filed by COMMERCE ESCROW COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 06/26/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketApplication (for Order to Deposit Interpleaded Funds With the Clerk of the Court); Filed by COMMERCE ESCROW COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by COMMERCE ESCROW COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by COMMERCE ESCROW COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Related Case); Filed by COMMERCE ESCROW COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by COMMERCE ESCROW COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMMERCE ESCROW COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marble Esq, Karen