This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/26/2022 at 10:37:05 (UTC).

COMERICA BANK, A CORPORATION VS CAROLANN CLARE KECK, TRUSTEE OF THE HOWARD B. KECK, JR LIVING TRUST AND SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR OF HOWARD B. KECK, JR, DECEAS

Case Summary

On 10/28/2019 COMERICA BANK, A CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CAROLANN CLARE KECK, TRUSTEE OF THE HOWARD B KECK, JR LIVING TRUST AND SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR OF HOWARD B KECK, JR, DECEAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL L. STERN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8573

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL L. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COMERICA BANK A CORPORATION

COMERICA BANK

Defendants

RUBIN MAYA SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR OF HOWARD B. KECK JR DECEASED

KECK CAROLANN CLARE TRUSTEE OF THE HOWARD B. KECK JR LIVING TRUST AND SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR OF HOWARD B. KECK JR DECEASED

RUBIN JASON SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR OF HOWARD B. KECK JR DECEASED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KATZ RONALD S.

SHAPIRO LEONA

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

1/5/2022: Case Management Statement

Status Conference Report - STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT PLAINTIFFS FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT RE STAY IN PROBATE PROCEEDINGS AND DECLARATION OF RONALD S. KATZ, IS SUPPORT THEREOF

1/12/2022: Status Conference Report - STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT PLAINTIFFS FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT RE STAY IN PROBATE PROCEEDINGS AND DECLARATION OF RONALD S. KATZ, IS SUPPORT THEREOF

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE STAY STATUS REPORT)

1/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE STAY STATUS REPORT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE STAY STATUS REPORT) OF 01/14/2022

1/14/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE STAY STATUS REPORT) OF 01/14/2022

Status Report

8/2/2021: Status Report

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/02/2021

8/2/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/02/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

8/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/22/2021

6/22/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/22/2021

Status Report

7/16/2020: Status Report

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/20/2020

7/20/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/20/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

7/20/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE RE STAY TO 6-24-2021

7/22/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE RE STAY TO 6-24-2021

Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF

6/3/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

5/4/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/04/2020

5/4/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/04/2020

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/12/2020

3/12/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/12/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/12/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2022
  • Hearing09/13/2022 at 11:45 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Status Conference (re Stay) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • Docketat 08:40 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re Stay Status Report)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Stay Status Report) of 01/14/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference Report (PLAINTIFF?S FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT RE STAY IN PROBATE PROCEEDINGS AND DECLARATION OF RONALD S. KATZ, IS SUPPORT THEREOF); Filed by Comerica Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Comerica Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Status Conference (re Stay) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • Docketat 4:39 PM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 08/02/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Comerica Bank, A Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketAmended Complaint (1st); Filed by Comerica Bank, A Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • Docket1st Amended Complaint; Filed by Comerica Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Summons; Filed by Comerica Bank, A Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Comerica Bank, A Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Comerica Bank, A Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Comerica Bank, A Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Comerica Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KATZ RONALD S

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAPIRO LEONA