Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2021 at 00:49:35 (UTC).

COLUMBU, FRANCESCO MARIA - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 10/07/2019 COLUMBU, FRANCESCO MARIA - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KLEIN, CLIFFORD and PRIVER, MARK S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9566

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KLEIN, CLIFFORD

PRIVER, MARK S.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COLUMBU DEBORAH

Claimants

DCM SERVICES

WELLS FARGO BANK N.A.

GE REAL PROP LP

STATE OF CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD

Decedent

COLUMBU FRANCESCO MARIA

Not Classified By Court

ANSON BRIAN W.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LIEBER JEFFREY EDWARD

Claimant Attorney

NITTI THOMAS ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

Probate Minute Order - Probate Master Minute Order

5/20/2021: Probate Minute Order - Probate Master Minute Order

Withdrawal - Creditor's Claim

5/5/2021: Withdrawal - Creditor's Claim

Account - Final or Waiver - First and Final Acct

3/8/2021: Account - Final or Waiver - First and Final Acct

Withdrawal - Special Notice

3/11/2021: Withdrawal - Special Notice

Creditor's Claim

12/8/2020: Creditor's Claim

Request - Special Notice (No Fee)

12/8/2020: Request - Special Notice (No Fee)

Probate Minute Order - Probate Master Minute Order

9/28/2020: Probate Minute Order - Probate Master Minute Order

Proposed Order - Order for Probate (DE-140)

6/18/2020: Proposed Order - Order for Probate (DE-140)

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative - Duties and Liabilities

6/18/2020: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative - Duties and Liabilities

Order - Probate

6/24/2020: Order - Probate

Bond

6/26/2020: Bond

Creditor's Claim - Creditor s Claim

1/17/2020: Creditor's Claim - Creditor s Claim

Creditor's Claim - American Express National Bank

1/6/2020: Creditor's Claim - American Express National Bank

Creditor's Claim

12/11/2019: Creditor's Claim

Minute Order

11/6/2019: Minute Order

Notice - Association of Counsel

10/25/2019: Notice - Association of Counsel

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

10/15/2019: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

10/7/2019: Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2021
  • Hearing07/28/2021 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 9 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Accounting Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid A; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 9, Priver, Mark S., Presiding; Status Report Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketPetition Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketWithdrawal - Creditor's Claim; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketWithdrawal - Special Notice; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid A; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketPetition Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketSupplement (Supplement ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketCreditor's Claim; Filed by Claimant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • Docketin Probate Department 9, Klein, Clifford, Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketProof of Publication (Proof of Publication ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketNotice (Association of Counsel ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DCM SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NITTI THOMAS ESQ.