Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/08/2020 at 02:04:09 (UTC).

COLUMBU, FRANCESCO - IN THE MATTER OF

Case Summary

On 12/20/2019 COLUMBU, FRANCESCO - IN THE MATTER OF was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LIPPITT, ELIZABETH A., MAY, GUS T. and KLEIN, CLIFFORD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1858

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LIPPITT, ELIZABETH A.

MAY, GUS T.

KLEIN, CLIFFORD

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COLUMBU DEBORAH

Claimant

U.S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Not Classified By Court

COLUMBU FRANCESCO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court Attorney

LIEBER JEFFREY EDWARD

 

Court Documents

Petition - Spousal/Domestic Partner Property (Initial)

12/20/2019: Petition - Spousal/Domestic Partner Property (Initial)

Order - Spousal Property

7/31/2020: Order - Spousal Property

Proposed Order - Proposed Order

7/15/2020: Proposed Order - Proposed Order

Minute Order

7/7/2020: Minute Order

Supplement - Supplement

4/30/2020: Supplement - Supplement

Notice - Continuance - Notice of Continuance

4/30/2020: Notice - Continuance - Notice of Continuance

Memorandum - Points and Authorities - Memorandum of Points and Authorities

4/15/2020: Memorandum - Points and Authorities - Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Miscellaneous Document - Rescission of Disclaimer of Maria Columbu

4/15/2020: Miscellaneous Document - Rescission of Disclaimer of Maria Columbu

Supplement - Supplement

4/15/2020: Supplement - Supplement

Minute Order

4/20/2020: Minute Order

Creditor's Claim

4/21/2020: Creditor's Claim

Minute Order

3/10/2020: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing

12/30/2019: Notice - Hearing

Supplement - to Spousal Property Petition of Deborah Drake Columbu

1/24/2020: Supplement - to Spousal Property Petition of Deborah Drake Columbu

Minute Order

3/3/2020: Minute Order

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketOrder - Spousal Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2020
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid A; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • Docketin Probate Department 9, Klein, Clifford, Presiding; Spousal Property Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketPetition Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketSupplement (Supplement ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketNotice - Continuance (Notice of Continuance ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketCreditor's Claim; Filed by Claimant

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketMemorandum - Points and Authorities (Memorandum of Points and Authorities ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketSupplement (Supplement ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • Docketin Probate Department 2D, May, Gus T., Presiding; Spousal Property Hearing - Ordered Transferred/Reassigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • Docketin Probate Department 29, Lippitt, Elizabeth A., Presiding; Spousal Property Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketSupplement (to Spousal Property Petition of Deborah Drake Columbu ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketNotice - Hearing; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketPetition - Spousal/Domestic Partner Property (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Bank National Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LIEBER JEFFREY EDWARD