This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/10/2022 at 18:31:49 (UTC).

COLUMBIS, PAUL N. VS DIAZ, II, JORGE

Case Summary

On 11/08/2022 COLUMBIS, PAUL N filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against DIAZ, II, JORGE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2064

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COLUMBIS PAUL N.

Respondent

DIAZ II JORGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

KOZICH S. DAVID

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet and Addendum

11/8/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet and Addendum

Proposed Form 109 - Notice - Court Hearing

11/8/2022: Proposed Form 109 - Notice - Court Hearing

Petition - Civil Harassment (violence)

11/8/2022: Petition - Civil Harassment (violence)

Proposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order

11/8/2022: Proposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

11/9/2022: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

11/9/2022: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment (violence); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketProposed Form 109 - Notice - Court Hearing; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (Civil Case Cover Sheet and Addendum ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketProposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KOZICH S. DAVID