This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/26/2022 at 00:38:34 (UTC).

COLORADO PARK VENTURES LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS PLAYING FORWARD, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/30/2022 COLORADO PARK VENTURES LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PLAYING FORWARD, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0456

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COLORADO PARK VENTURES LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

ATTARD JOHN

PLAYING FORWARD LLC A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

TALBOT VICTOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LONG H. G.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

3/30/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/30/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/30/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/30/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/30/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

9/15/2022: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

9/14/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

9/14/2022: Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/14/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2022
  • Hearing09/26/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department O at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketAffidavit (AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE); Filed by COLORADO PARK VENTURES LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by COLORADO PARK VENTURES LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by COLORADO PARK VENTURES LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by COLORADO PARK VENTURES LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by COLORADO PARK VENTURES LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by COLORADO PARK VENTURES LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LONG HELEN GRAYCE