This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/21/2022 at 21:18:47 (UTC).

COLMENARES-CURRIER, MATTHEW FREDDY -CONSERVATORSHIP

Case Summary

On 06/14/2022 COLMENARES-CURRIER, MATTHEW FREDDY -CONSERVATORSHIP was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5904

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COLMENARES SHANNON CHRISTINA

Not Classified By Court

COLMENARES-CURRIER MATTHEW FREDDY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WATERSON CYNTHIA J

Not Classified By Court Attorney

O'NEILL MARY LOUISE

 

Court Documents

Petition - Appoint Ltd Conservator of Person/P&E (Initial)

6/14/2022: Petition - Appoint Ltd Conservator of Person/P&E (Initial)

Duties of Conservator/Acknowledgment of Receipt of Handbook

6/14/2022: Duties of Conservator/Acknowledgment of Receipt of Handbook

Consent - To Act As Conservators Of The Person

6/14/2022: Consent - To Act As Conservators Of The Person

Citation - Issued

6/14/2022: Citation - Issued

Order - Appointing Counsel

6/15/2022: Order - Appointing Counsel

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2022
  • Hearing08/23/2022 at 10:30 AM in Probate Department 29 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Appointment Hearing - Conservator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketCAC Appointment Required

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketCitation (Issued ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketConfidential Screening Form; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketNotification - Cons/Guard Address; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketNotification - Cons/Guard Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketNotification - Cons/Guard Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketNotification - Cons/Guard Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketConfidential Screening Form; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketConfidential Screening Form; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketConfidential Screening Form; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketDuties of Conservator/Acknowledgment of Receipt of Handbook; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketConfidential Supplemental Info Sheet; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketPetition - Appoint Ltd Conservator of Person/P&E (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketConsent (To Act As Conservators Of The Person ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer O'NEILL MARY LOUISE