This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/04/2019 at 07:13:55 (UTC).

COLLINS, CLARA FOBBS - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 05/05/2017 COLLINS, CLARA FOBBS - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHNSON, BARBARA R., COWAN, DAVID J., STRATTON, MARIA E. and SMALL, MICHAEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3951

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JOHNSON, BARBARA R.

COWAN, DAVID J.

STRATTON, MARIA E.

SMALL, MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JONES GAYLE

Claimant

POWELL CHONTORIA WILLIAMS

Decedent

COLLINS CLARA FOBBS

Others

KELLY KAHALIA

JONES CONCHA

Not Classified By Court

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MOTEN KEITH JOSEPH

Other and Claimant Attorneys

KERNS BENNETT

SWAN ANGELA RENA

 

Court Documents

Bond - U.S. Specialty Insurance Company

7/26/2017: Bond - U.S. Specialty Insurance Company

Ex Parte - Petition

12/26/2017: Ex Parte - Petition

Substitution of Attorney

4/5/2018: Substitution of Attorney

Order - Confirming Sale - Order Confirming Sale of Real Property

4/30/2018: Order - Confirming Sale - Order Confirming Sale of Real Property

Notice - Hearing

3/21/2018: Notice - Hearing

Minute Order

7/18/2018: Minute Order

Order - Transfer - re: Peremptory Challenge to Hon. David J. Cowan As Per CCP 170.6

5/12/2017: Order - Transfer - re: Peremptory Challenge to Hon. David J. Cowan As Per CCP 170.6

Notice - Lien - Notice of Lien 2

10/16/2018: Notice - Lien - Notice of Lien 2

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

5/10/2017: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

Notice - Hearing

9/19/2018: Notice - Hearing

PR_General Probate - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - CENTRAL PROBATE

5/5/2017: PR_General Probate - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - CENTRAL PROBATE

Cover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037)

7/27/2018: Cover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037)

Declaration

12/26/2017: Declaration

Ex Parte - Order - Denied

12/28/2017: Ex Parte - Order - Denied

170.6 CCP Affidavit of Prejudice

5/12/2017: 170.6 CCP Affidavit of Prejudice

Inventory & Appraisal - Reappraisal for Sale

12/4/2017: Inventory & Appraisal - Reappraisal for Sale

Minute Order

10/9/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/18/2018: Minute Order

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2018
  • Order (ORDER SETTLING FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT, ET AL ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • in Probate Department 5, Small, Michael, Presiding; Accounting Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Petition Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Notice - Hearing; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • Notice - Lien (Notice of Lien 2 ); Filed by Lien Claimant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • Notice - Lien (Notice of Lien 1 ); Filed by Lien Claimant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • in Probate Department 5, Small, Michael, Presiding; Accounting Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Supplement (Supplement to the First and Final Account and Report of Administrator, et al. ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 06/06/2017
  • in Probate Department 5, Stratton, Maria E., Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • Proof of Publication; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • in Probate Department 79, Cowan, David J., Presiding; Court Order Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • Order - Transfer (re: Peremptory Challenge to Hon. David J. Cowan As Per CCP 170.6 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • 170.6 CCP Affidavit of Prejudice; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • Notice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Cover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less