This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/16/2020 at 06:21:05 (UTC).

COLLIER-RAMSAY, NEDRA VS RAMSAY, EVERTON

Case Summary

On 04/03/2020 COLLIER-RAMSAY, NEDRA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against RAMSAY, EVERTON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0340

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COLLIER-RAMSAY NEDRA

Respondent

RAMSAY EVERTON

 

Court Documents

Notice - Case Assignment

4/3/2020: Notice - Case Assignment

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

4/3/2020: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Summons

4/3/2020: Summons

Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child - Court to Verify Resident or Place of Work.

4/3/2020: Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child - Court to Verify Resident or Place of Work.

Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property

4/3/2020: Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

4/3/2020: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

4/3/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Proof of Service of Summons

4/9/2020: Proof of Service of Summons

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child (Court to Verify Resident or Place of Work. ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.