This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/11/2023 at 03:26:14 (UTC).

COLIN HARRIGAN VS JET, A BUSINESS ORGANIZATION, FORM UNKNOWN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/03/2022 COLIN HARRIGAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against JET, A BUSINESS ORGANIZATION, FORM UNKNOWN,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4333

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARRIGAN COLIN

Defendants

BUILD GROUP A BUSINESS ORGANIZATION FORM UNKNOWN

JET A BUSINESS ORGANIZATION FORM UNKNOWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WEGMAN ATTICUS N.

Defendant Attorneys

HERZOG VANESSA K.

LEE JOSHUA D.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

2/3/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/3/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/3/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/3/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

2/22/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/22/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

4/25/2022: Answer

Answer

9/20/2022: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2025
  • Hearing01/30/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2023
  • Hearing08/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2023
  • Hearing07/20/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: JPW INDUSTRIES INC. Erroneously Sued As JET, a business organization, form unknown (Defendant); As to: COLIN HARRIGAN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: BUILD GROUP CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC. Erroneously Sued As BUILD GROUP, a business organization, form unknown (Defendant); As to: COLIN HARRIGAN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: COLIN HARRIGAN (Plaintiff); As to: BUILD GROUP, a business organization, form unknown (Defendant); Service Date: 02/16/2022; Service Cost: 425.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: COLIN HARRIGAN (Plaintiff); As to: JET, a business organization, form unknown (Defendant); Service Date: 02/16/2022; Service Cost: 425.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: COLIN HARRIGAN (Plaintiff); As to: JET, a business organization, form unknown (Defendant); BUILD GROUP, a business organization, form unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: COLIN HARRIGAN (Plaintiff); As to: JET, a business organization, form unknown (Defendant); BUILD GROUP, a business organization, form unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: COLIN HARRIGAN (Plaintiff); As to: JET, a business organization, form unknown (Defendant); BUILD GROUP, a business organization, form unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 07/20/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 01/30/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jill Feeney in Department 30 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEGMAN, ATTICUS