This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2019 at 03:09:27 (UTC).

COLETTE MARTIN VS PROJECT CLUB LA ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/06/2018 a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury case was filed by COLETTE MARTIN against PROJECT CLUB LA in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6787

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

MARTIN COLETTE

Respondents and Defendants

DOES 1 TO 20

B+G HOSPITALITY GROUP

PROJECT CLUB LA

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

9/28/2018: Proof of Service

Proof of Service

9/28/2018: Proof of Service

Answer

11/5/2018: Answer

Unknown

3/26/2019: Unknown

Request for Dismissal

6/13/2019: Request for Dismissal

SUMMONS

3/6/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

3/6/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Colette Martin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • Notice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Project Club LA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Project Club LA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by Colette Martin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by Colette Martin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Colette Martin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC696787    Hearing Date: February 05, 2020    Dept: 29

Martin v. Project Club LA et al.

The hearing on the Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant Hollywood and Ivar, LLC dba Project Los Angeles is CONTINUED to permit Plaintiff’s counsel to cure procedural defects with respect to representation of the Plaintiff by Kurt Zimmerman, who prepared Plaintiff’s opposition, but who is not Plaintiff’s counsel of record. The hearing is continued to February 14, 2020 at 1:30 p.m.

Plaintiff did not file a consent to the substitution of Mr. Zimmerman for present counsel Joel M. Ward.

An attorney in an action or proceeding may be changed at any time, upon the consent of both client and attorney, filed with the clerk, or entered upon the minutes, or upon order of the court, upon the application of either client or attorney, after notice from one to the other. Cal Code Civil Procedure § 284.

The court’s file does not reflect that a substitution has been filed nor a court order obtained permitting the limited scope representation after application. While present counsel, Kurt Zimmerman, discloses that he was retained for a limited scope, the court’s file does not reflect that Plaintiff filed such a notice with the court on Judicial Council form CIV-150. Cal Rules of Court 3.36.

Accordingly, the court cannot proceed with the hearing until counsel complies with Cal Code Civil Procedure § 284 prior to the hearing.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.