This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/01/2020 at 02:42:41 (UTC).

COLBY1, LLC, ET AL. VS JOSEPH AZIZI, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/16/2019 COLBY1, LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against JOSEPH AZIZI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CRAIG D. KARLAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1849

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CRAIG D. KARLAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

YOUNG JOAN A.

COLBY1 LLC

YOUNG FRANK J.

Defendants

HERNANDEZ ALONSO GERARDO

AZIZI JOSEPH

EVAZPOOR ARDI

TORBATY SHAHRZAD

HERNANDEZ MARIA OLIMPIA

KARIMIRAD MANUCHEHR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHITMAN SCOTT L

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)

2/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL) OF 02/28/2020

2/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL) OF 02/28/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE SETTLEMENT;)

1/13/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE SETTLEMENT;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE SETTLEMENT;) OF 01/13/2020

1/13/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE SETTLEMENT;) OF 01/13/2020

Notice of Settlement

1/3/2020: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE REQUEST FOR TRIAL DATE ON UNLAW...)

12/17/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE REQUEST FOR TRIAL DATE ON UNLAW...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE REQUEST FOR TRIAL DATE ON UNLAW...) OF 12/17/2019

12/17/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE REQUEST FOR TRIAL DATE ON UNLAW...) OF 12/17/2019

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/19/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/13/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

10/25/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/25/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/25/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/25/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

10/28/2019: Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Declaration re: Due Diligence

10/30/2019: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

10/30/2019: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Personal Service

10/30/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/31/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal) of 02/28/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial (with a 2 hour estimate) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • Docketat 4:34 PM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Settlement;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re Settlement;) of 01/13/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Colby1, LLC (Plaintiff); Frank J. Young (Plaintiff); Joan A. Young (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • Docketat 10:50 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Shahrzad Torbaty)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Ardi Evazpoor)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Joseph Azizi)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Colby1, LLC (Plaintiff); Frank J. Young (Plaintiff); Joan A. Young (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Colby1, LLC (Plaintiff); Frank J. Young (Plaintiff); Joan A. Young (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Colby1, LLC (Plaintiff); Frank J. Young (Plaintiff); Joan A. Young (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WHITMAN SCOTT L