This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2021 at 06:42:12 (UTC).

COHNREZNICK CAPITAL MARKETS SECURITIES, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS STRATFORD INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 03/12/2021 COHNREZNICK CAPITAL MARKETS SECURITIES, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against STRATFORD INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9756

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COHNREZNICK CAPITAL MARKETS SECURITIES LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendant

STRATFORD INSURANCE COMPANY A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

O'HANLON MATTHEW B.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

3/12/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/12/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/16/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL IN LIGHT OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT

5/11/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL IN LIGHT OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

5/6/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/06/2021

5/6/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/06/2021

Notice of Settlement

5/5/2021: Notice of Settlement

Request for Dismissal

6/18/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL IN LIGHT OF SETTLEMENT

6/8/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL IN LIGHT OF SETTLEMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)

6/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)

Response - RESPONSE JOINT RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL IN LIGHT OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT

6/4/2021: Response - RESPONSE JOINT RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL IN LIGHT OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by COHNREZNICK CAPITAL MARKETS SECURITIES, LLC, a limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL IN LIGHT OF SETTLEMENT); Filed by COHNREZNICK CAPITAL MARKETS SECURITIES, LLC, a limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketResponse (Joint Response to Order to Show Cause Re Dismissal In Light of Conditional Settlement); Filed by COHNREZNICK CAPITAL MARKETS SECURITIES, LLC, a limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketNotice (OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL IN LIGHT OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT); Filed by COHNREZNICK CAPITAL MARKETS SECURITIES, LLC, a limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • Docketat 1:50 PM in Department 57; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/06/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by COHNREZNICK CAPITAL MARKETS SECURITIES, LLC, a limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by COHNREZNICK CAPITAL MARKETS SECURITIES, LLC, a limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by COHNREZNICK CAPITAL MARKETS SECURITIES, LLC, a limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by COHNREZNICK CAPITAL MARKETS SECURITIES, LLC, a limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Stratford Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer O'HANLON MATTHEW