This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/10/2023 at 13:48:47 (UTC).

COHEN, DOUGLAS VS COHEN, SHERRIE

Case Summary

On 05/16/2022 COHEN, DOUGLAS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against COHEN, SHERRIE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KIM, GIA, ROBERTS, GARY D and AMERIAN, MICHAEL R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0710

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KIM, GIA

ROBERTS, GARY D

AMERIAN, MICHAEL R

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COHEN DOUGLAS

Respondent

COHEN SHERRIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

STANKOWSKI JULIE DRAZEN

Respondent Attorney

REINKE ANJA MARTHA

Other Attorneys

MAK IRENE M

DUJAN SONIA B

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

1/25/2023: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/25/2023: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/25/2023: Minute Order

Notice - Continuance

1/24/2023: Notice - Continuance

Responsive Declaration - Responsive Declaration

1/13/2023: Responsive Declaration - Responsive Declaration

Minute Order

1/11/2023: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/11/2023: Minute Order

Declaration - Income and Expense - Declaration - Income and Expense

12/8/2022: Declaration - Income and Expense - Declaration - Income and Expense

Minute Order

12/7/2022: Minute Order

Declaration - Income and Expense - Petitioner's Income and Expense Declaration (Declarations)

12/5/2022: Declaration - Income and Expense - Petitioner's Income and Expense Declaration (Declarations)

Notice - Trial Setting Conference

11/28/2022: Notice - Trial Setting Conference

Notice - Trial Setting Conference

11/28/2022: Notice - Trial Setting Conference

Order - After Hearing

11/17/2022: Order - After Hearing

Responsive Declaration - Responsive Declaration (Declarations)

11/22/2022: Responsive Declaration - Responsive Declaration (Declarations)

Proof of Service - Proof of Service (Comment)

11/15/2022: Proof of Service - Proof of Service (Comment)

Statement - Separate

11/14/2022: Statement - Separate

RFO/MTN - Compel Initial

11/14/2022: RFO/MTN - Compel Initial

Request - Trial Setting-Counter - Request - Trial Setting-Counter

11/7/2022: Request - Trial Setting-Counter - Request - Trial Setting-Counter

55 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2023
  • Hearing04/26/2023 at 8:30 AM in Department Y at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; RFO - Child Support

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • Hearing04/26/2023 at 8:30 AM in Department Y at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Trial Setting Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • Hearing04/26/2023 at 8:30 AM in Department Y at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; RFO - Compel Initial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department Y, Roberts, Gary D, Presiding; RFO - Child Support - Not Held - Continued by Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department Y, Roberts, Gary D, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Continued by Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department Y, Roberts, Gary D, Presiding; RFO - Compel Initial - Not Held - Continued by Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketNotice - Continuance; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
83 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given) (Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given) (Declarations) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketResponsive Declaration (Responsive Declaration ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketEx Parte - Application (Ex Parte - FL-300 RFO/RFO Mod - Custody/Visitation - (Ex Parte) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketEx Parte - Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons (Proof of Service of Summons (Proof of Service) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 (Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 (Comment) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketSummons (Summons (Summons) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA (Declaration - UCCJEA (Declarations) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less