This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/04/2021 at 20:01:13 (UTC).

CODY BOULWARE, ET AL. VS THE ROSE CAFE AND MARKET, INC.

Case Summary

On 11/17/2020 CODY BOULWARE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THE ROSE CAFE AND MARKET, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4006

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BOGGS ANDREW

BOULWARE CODY

CHAMPION GARRET

ROSENBERG DUSTIN

ROSHAN MATIN

Defendant

THE ROSE CAFE AND MARKET INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GLASSMAN ROBERT S.

Defendant Attorney

FOX DANA ALDEN

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/11/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/17/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Answer

2/18/2021: Answer

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

2/22/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

PI General Order

12/28/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

12/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

Proof of Personal Service

1/5/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/17/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/17/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/17/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

11/17/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2023
  • Hearing11/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • Hearing05/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • Hearing05/03/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by The Rose Cafe and Market, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Cody Boulware (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Andrew Boggs (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Cody Boulware (Plaintiff); Matin Roshan (Plaintiff); Andrew Boggs (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Cody Boulware (Plaintiff); Matin Roshan (Plaintiff); Andrew Boggs (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Cody Boulware (Plaintiff); Matin Roshan (Plaintiff); Andrew Boggs (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Cody Boulware (Plaintiff); Matin Roshan (Plaintiff); Andrew Boggs (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE ROSE CAFE AND MARKET INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FOX DANA ALDEN ESQ.