This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/27/2022 at 10:49:16 (UTC).

COBOS, LUZ ELENA - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 06/08/2021 COBOS, LUZ ELENA - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAY, GUS T.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5622

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAY, GUS T.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FLORES MICHAEL

Claimants

DCM SERVICES

BANK OF AMERICA N.A.

ASCENSIONPOINT RECOVERY SERVICES LLC

DCM SERVICES ON BEHALF OF VERIZON WIRELESS

OO KIM S

VERIZON WIRELESS

DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES

Decedent

COBOS LUZ ELENA

Not Classified By Court

FINCH MARY ARLENE

PHILLIPS & COHEN ASSOCIATES LTD.

ENSIGN WHITTIER EAST LLC

FIRST SOUTHWESTERN FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC

Others

GONZALES GREGORY J.

GONZALES STANLEY J. JR

HOWELL PAMELA

KELLER JUDITH LYNN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CASAS JUVENTINO B. JR

Other Attorney

VARGA LINDA MORAVEC

Not Classified By Court Attorney

YOUNG WILLIAM MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Request - Special Notice (No Fee)

3/22/2022: Request - Special Notice (No Fee)

Creditor's Claim

3/22/2022: Creditor's Claim

Letters (Initial)

12/1/2021: Letters (Initial)

Bond - Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

12/1/2021: Bond - Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

Notice - Proposed Action

2/1/2022: Notice - Proposed Action

Creditor's Claim

1/4/2022: Creditor's Claim

Inventory & Appraisal - final $722,750.00

1/7/2022: Inventory & Appraisal - final $722,750.00

Creditor's Claim - on behalf of Synchrony Bank

10/25/2021: Creditor's Claim - on behalf of Synchrony Bank

Creditor's Claim

11/10/2021: Creditor's Claim

Creditor's Claim - Capital One

8/25/2021: Creditor's Claim - Capital One

Creditor's Claim

9/10/2021: Creditor's Claim

Creditor's Claim

8/2/2021: Creditor's Claim

Creditor's Claim

8/11/2021: Creditor's Claim

Creditor's Claim - American Express National Bank

7/23/2021: Creditor's Claim - American Express National Bank

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

7/15/2021: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

Order - Appointing Personal Representative

7/21/2021: Order - Appointing Personal Representative

Nomination - Nomination and Declination to Act as Administrator

6/10/2021: Nomination - Nomination and Declination to Act as Administrator

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2022
  • Hearing12/16/2022 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 2D at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketRequest - Special Notice (No Fee); Filed by Claimant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketCreditor's Claim; Filed by Claimant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketNotice - Proposed Action; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketInventory & Appraisal (final $722,750.00 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketCreditor's Claim; Filed by Claimant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketBond (Liberty Mutual Insurance Company ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketLetters (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketCreditor's Claim; Filed by Claimant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketCreditor's Claim (on behalf of Synchrony Bank ); Filed by Claimant

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketWaiver - (No Fee) (Waiver ); Filed by Heir

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketSupplement (To Petition ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCreditor's Claim (Claim filed by Phillips & Cohen Associates Ltd on behalf of Barclays Bank Delaware ); Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketCreditor's Claim; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketRequest - Special Notice (Request for Special Notice ); Filed by Heir

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate (Notice of Petition to Administer Estate ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketNomination (Nomination and Declination to Act as Administrator ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketNomination (Nomination and Declination to Act as Administrator ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ENSIGN WHITTIER EAST LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where First Southwestern Financial Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ASCENSIONPOINT RECOVERY SERVICES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where DCM SERVICES is a litigant