This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/04/2017 at 12:35:26 (UTC).

COALITION OF PARENTS TO SAVE LARK ELLEN ET AL VS COVINA VALL

Case Summary

On 05/11/2017 COALITION OF PARENTS TO SAVE LARK ELLEN filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against COVINA VALL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARY H. STROBEL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9625

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARY H. STROBEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

COALITION OF PARENTS TO SAVE LARK ELLEN

Defendants and Respondents

SHEEHAN RICHARD

BOARD OF EDUCATION CVUSD

COVINA VALLEY UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Other

FRIEDMAN CHARLES J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ANGEL ARTHUR R. ESQ.

Respondent Attorney

EVANS SUE ANN SALMON ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

10/23/2017: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

10/23/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

VERIFIED PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE WRIT OF MANDAMUS/WRIT OF MANDATE & COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

5/11/2017: VERIFIED PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE WRIT OF MANDAMUS/WRIT OF MANDATE & COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

EXHIBITS TO VERIFIED PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE WRIT OF MANDAMUS/WRIT OF MANDATE & COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

5/11/2017: EXHIBITS TO VERIFIED PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE WRIT OF MANDAMUS/WRIT OF MANDATE & COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

SUMMONS

5/11/2017: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF TRIAL-SETTING CONFERENCE

6/7/2017: NOTICE OF TRIAL-SETTING CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

6/8/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

DECLARATION OF ARTHUR R. ANGEL IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR STAY

6/27/2017: DECLARATION OF ARTHUR R. ANGEL IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR STAY

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE HEARING DATE ON MOTION FOR STAY; ETC

6/29/2017: EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE HEARING DATE ON MOTION FOR STAY; ETC

Minute Order

7/10/2017: Minute Order

STIPULATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND ORDER

7/10/2017: STIPULATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND ORDER

RESPONDENTS' OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF MEGGAN BRONNER IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONERS' MOTION TO STAY

7/26/2017: RESPONDENTS' OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF MEGGAN BRONNER IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONERS' MOTION TO STAY

RESPONDENTS' OPPOSITION TO PETITIONERS' MOTION TO STAY

7/26/2017: RESPONDENTS' OPPOSITION TO PETITIONERS' MOTION TO STAY

RESPONDENTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE PETITIONERS' VERIFIED PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE WRIT OF MANDAMUS/WRIT OF MANDATE AND; ETC.

7/31/2017: RESPONDENTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE PETITIONERS' VERIFIED PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE WRIT OF MANDAMUS/WRIT OF MANDATE AND; ETC.

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF ADDITIONAL COUNSEL FOR PETITIONERS

8/1/2017: NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF ADDITIONAL COUNSEL FOR PETITIONERS

PETITIONERS' REPLY BRIEF ON MOTION FOR STAY

8/1/2017: PETITIONERS' REPLY BRIEF ON MOTION FOR STAY

Minute Order

8/8/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING AND NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER ON MOTION TO STAY

8/28/2017: NOTICE OF RULING AND NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER ON MOTION TO STAY

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTEIS AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • Notice (OF ASSOCIATION OF ADDITIONAL COUNSEL FOR PETITIONERS ) Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • Brief-Reply (PETITIONERS' REPLY BRIEF ON MOTION FOR STAY ) Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • Motion to Strike Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Opposition Document (TO PETITIONERS MOTION TO STAY ) Filed by Attorney for Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Objection Document (TO DEC OF MEGGAN BRONNER IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONERS MOTION TO STAY ) Filed by Attorney for Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • Notice (OF ORDER ON STIPULATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE "BY FAX" ) Filed by Attorney for Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • Stipulation and Order (TO CONTINUE TSC ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • Demurrer (TO PETITIONERS' VERIFIED PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE WRIT OF MANDAMUS/WRIT OF MANDATE AND COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF "BY FAX") Filed by Attorney for Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • Opposition Document (to ex parte ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • Ex-parte Request for Order Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • Declaration (OF ARTHUR R. ANGEL IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR STAY ) Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • Notice of Motion (AND MOTION FOR STAY ) Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • Notice of Trial Setting Conference Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • Notice of Trial Setting Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • Declaration (OF MEGGAN BRONNER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR STAY ) Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COVINA VALLEY UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANGEL ARTHUR R. ESQ.