This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/17/2019 at 08:36:44 (UTC).

CMG WORLDWIDE, INC. VS DREAMS FULFILLED, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 CMG WORLDWIDE, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DREAMS FULFILLED, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA A. MEIERS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0037

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA A. MEIERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CMG WORLDWIDE INC.

Defendant

DREAMS FULFILLED LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SINAI AZADEH

Defendant Attorney

FRASER COLIN W

 

Court Documents

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

7/29/2019: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

7/31/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/31/2019

7/31/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/31/2019

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

8/1/2019: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

8/1/2019: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

10/3/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

7/11/2019: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Notice of Reclassification

7/11/2019: Notice of Reclassification

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Colin W Fraser (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by CMG Worldwide, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • Docketat 4:30 PM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 07/31/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Dreams Fulfilled, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Reclassification; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 94; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice) of 03/11/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by Dreams Fulfilled, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF AZADEH SINAI IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE); Filed by CMG Worldwide, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketApplication to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice; Filed by CMG Worldwide, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF THEODORE J. MINCH IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE); Filed by CMG Worldwide, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CMG Worldwide, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CMG Worldwide, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CMG Worldwide, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC00037    Hearing Date: September 17, 2020    Dept: 50

 

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 50

cmg worldwide, inc.,

Plaintiff,

vs.

dreams fulfilled, llc, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.:

19STLC00037

Hearing Date:

September 17, 2020

Hearing Time:

10:00 a.m.

ORDER RE:

THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES FROM DEFENDANT/THIRD-PARTY PLAINTIFF

AND RELATED CROSS-ACTION

The motion by Third-Party Defendants Rachel Robinson and the Estate of Jackie Robinson (“Cross-Defendants”) to compel discovery responses from Defendant/Third-Party Plaintiff Dreams Fulfilled, LLC (“Dreams Fulfilled”) will be continued to a new date as set forth below. NO HEARING ON THE MOTION WILL TAKE PLACE ON SEPTEMBER 17, 2020.

Code of Civil Procedure section 2016.080 to the Code of Civil Procedure provides, at subdivision (a): “If an informal resolution is not reached by the parties, as described in Section 2016.040, the court may conduct an informal discovery conference upon request by a party or on the court's own motion for the purpose of discussing discovery matters in dispute between the parties.” Pursuant to that Section and to the Courtroom Information posted on the Court’s website for Dept. 50 (copies also provided in Dept. 50), and the Court’s power to “amend and control its process and orders so as to make them conform to law and justice” pursuant to CCP

§ 128(a)(8), the Court orders the parties in this case to participate in an Informal Discovery Conference (“IDC”).

Lead or other designated counsel for the parties with full authority are ordered to participate in person in an IDC pursuant to the Court’s power under Code of Civil Procedure section 128(a)(8) and Code of Civil Procedure section 2016.040. After consulting with opposing counsel regarding available dates, Cross-Defendants must make a prompt reservation for the IDC using the Court’s online reservation system.

Once Cross-Defendants have confirmed an IDC date, Cross-Defendants must use the Court’s online reservation system to continue this motion to a post-IDC discovery hearing date. The parties are ordered to have with them whatever materials are needed to make the IDC session productive and successful.

Prior to the IDC date, lead or other designated counsel for the parties, with full authority, are to meet and confer, in person or via telephone (Zoom, WebEx or the like is permitted instead of in-person meetings) in a further attempt to resolve as many of the issues as possible before the IDC. (See CRC Rule 3.670(f)(2).) If the parties resolve their discovery disputes before the IDC date, Cross-Defendants are ordered to take both the IDC and this motion off calendar as soon as possible.

Cross-Defendants are ordered to provide notice of this Order.

DATED: September 16, 2020

________________________________

Hon. Teresa A. Beaudet

Judge, Los Angeles Superior Court

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CMG Worldwide Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Colin W Fraser