This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/13/2019 at 04:03:37 (UTC).

CMC STEEL FABRICATORS, INC., DBA CMC REBAR, A SUBSIDIARY OF COMMERCIAL METALS COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION VS FORESTAR CHATSWORTH, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/17/2019 CMC STEEL FABRICATORS, INC , DBA CMC REBAR, A SUBSIDIARY OF COMMERCIAL METALS COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against FORESTAR CHATSWORTH, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0587

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CMC STEEL FABRICATORS INC. DBA CMC REBAR A SUBSIDIARY OF COMMERCIAL METALS COMPANY A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Defendants

LEXON INSURANCE COMPANY A TENNESSEE CORPORATION

FORESTAR CHATSWORTH LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GLADYCH JOHN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

10/24/2019: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

11/6/2019: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/16/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/16/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

8/29/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/17/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

7/17/2019: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/17/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/17/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/18/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by CMC Steel Fabricators, Inc., dba CMC Rebar, a subsidiary of Commercial Metals Company, a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by CMC Steel Fabricators, Inc., dba CMC Rebar, a subsidiary of Commercial Metals Company, a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by CMC Steel Fabricators, Inc., dba CMC Rebar, a subsidiary of Commercial Metals Company, a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by CMC Steel Fabricators, Inc., dba CMC Rebar, a subsidiary of Commercial Metals Company, a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CMC Steel Fabricators, Inc., dba CMC Rebar, a subsidiary of Commercial Metals Company, a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CMC Steel Fabricators, Inc., dba CMC Rebar, a subsidiary of Commercial Metals Company, a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CMC Steel Fabricators, Inc., dba CMC Rebar, a subsidiary of Commercial Metals Company, a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CMC STEEL FABRICATORS, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where LEXON INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GLADYCH ESQ, JOHN A.