This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/26/2021 at 13:17:05 (UTC).

CLYDE SEALS VS BOARD OF SUPERVISORS FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/05/2020 CLYDE SEALS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BOARD OF SUPERVISORS FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2577

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEALS CLYDE

Defendants

BOARD OF SUPERVISORS FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

PALACINO AN INDIVIDUAL LILIANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LABOVITCH GERALD ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

BACIO GARY A.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/5/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/5/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/5/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/5/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

12/2/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

12/2/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Answer

1/28/2021: Answer

Answer

3/10/2021: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2023
  • Hearing11/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • Hearing05/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • Hearing04/21/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Liliana Palacino a government employee of the County of Los Angeles Erroneously Sued As Board of Supervisors for the County of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Liliana Palacino a government employee of the County of Los Angeles Erroneously Sued As Board of Supervisors for the County of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Clyde Seals (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clyde Seals (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Clyde Seals (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less