This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/12/2022 at 02:27:36 (UTC).

CLYDE MALBROUGH VS U-HAUL CO. OF CALIFORNIA

Case Summary

On 12/08/2021 CLYDE MALBROUGH filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against U-HAUL CO OF CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAREN NELSON. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4691

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAREN NELSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MALBROUGH CLYDE

Defendant

U-HAUL CO. OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MAURO GREGORY ESTEBAN

HAWKINS JAMES R.

Defendant Attorneys

GRAY LALONNIE VILLA

GIAMELA LONNIE D.

 

Court Documents

Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER RE REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

4/27/2022: Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER RE REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: SUBMISSION OR REQUEST FOR DISM...)

5/3/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: SUBMISSION OR REQUEST FOR DISM...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

4/26/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

3/15/2022: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE

3/25/2022: Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

3/25/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Unknown - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

3/25/2022: Unknown - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

Notice - NOTICE OF MINUTE ORDER

3/28/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF MINUTE ORDER

Notice of Appearance

3/16/2022: Notice of Appearance

Joint Status Conference Report - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

3/17/2022: Joint Status Conference Report - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

3/15/2022: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/24/2022, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

2/24/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/24/2022, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

2/24/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Initial Status Conference Order

2/24/2022: Initial Status Conference Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

2/24/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice - NOTICE OF MINUTE ORDER AND INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

3/2/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF MINUTE ORDER AND INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/8/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 17, Maren Nelson, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (reSubmission or Request for Dismissal) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Submission or Request for Dism...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketOrder (re: Request for Dismissal); Filed by Clyde Malbrough (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 17, Maren Nelson, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Initial Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Minute Order); Filed by Clyde Malbrough (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 17, Maren Nelson, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Initial Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketOrder (Authorizing Electronic Service); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Minute Order and Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clyde Malbrough (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • Docketat 4:10 PM in Department 17, Maren Nelson, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Clyde Malbrough (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 02/24/2022, Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clyde Malbrough (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Clyde Malbrough (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Clyde Malbrough (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U-HAUL CO. OF CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GIAMELA, LONNIE D