Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/07/2019 at 01:57:13 (UTC).

CLOSET INC VS YOUNG HYUN INTERNATIONAL INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/11/2017 CLOSET INC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against YOUNG HYUN INTERNATIONAL INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL JOHNSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5475

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL JOHNSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CLOSET INC.

Defendants and Respondents

JUN YONG S.

YOUNG HYUN INTERNATIONAL INC.

DOES 1 TO 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

GRAMERCY LAW GROUP PC

HWANG HENRY

Defendant Attorney

LEE FRANK N. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

2/14/2018: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

Minute Order

4/25/2018: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

4/25/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION

5/2/2018: APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION

NOTICE OF REJECTION APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION

5/31/2018: NOTICE OF REJECTION APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION

APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION

6/19/2018: APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION

DEFENDANT YONG SUK JUN'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

8/22/2018: DEFENDANT YONG SUK JUN'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT-UNLAWFUL DETAINER

9/28/2018: COMPLAINT-UNLAWFUL DETAINER

Notice

10/12/2018: Notice

Unknown

3/13/2019: Unknown

Notice of Ruling

3/14/2019: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Ruling

4/22/2019: Notice of Ruling

APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

10/16/2017: APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

Unknown

11/22/2017: Unknown

Minute Order

12/7/2017: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT UNLAWFUL DETAINER- EVICTION

10/20/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT UNLAWFUL DETAINER- EVICTION

Unknown

9/14/2017: Unknown

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/14/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 56; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 56; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Yong S. Jun (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel; Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 56; Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Order (RE: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Yong S. Jun (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by Frank N. Lee, Esq. (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by Frank N. Lee, Esq. (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 56; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
71 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT UNLAWFUL DETAINER- EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Closet, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • COMPLAINT-UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • SUMMONS (UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where YOUNG HYUN INTERNATIONAL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CLOSET INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEE FRANK N.