This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/25/2023 at 00:26:15 (UTC).

CLORIESE S. GRAYSON VS DEANCO HEALTHCARE, LLC, A BUSINESS ENTITY, FORM UNKNOWN,, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/02/2022 CLORIESE S GRAYSON filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against DEANCO HEALTHCARE, LLC, A BUSINESS ENTITY, FORM UNKNOWN,,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VIRGINIA KEENY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1847

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

VIRGINIA KEENY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GRAYSON CLORIESE S.

CLORIESE S. GRAYSON DECEASED TIM GRAYSON AS THE SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST OF

GRAYSON TIM

Defendants

DEANCO HEALTHCARE LLC A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN

MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN

DEANCO HEALTHCARE LLC

MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHAHROKH KOOROSH K

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

9/19/2023: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Mail

8/29/2023: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

8/29/2023: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/28/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/15/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Mail

8/15/2023: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

8/15/2023: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

8/11/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/11/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

8/4/2023: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

8/4/2023: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Service by Mail

7/27/2023: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

7/21/2023: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

7/21/2023: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Ruling

7/17/2023: Notice of Ruling

Proof of Service by Mail

7/17/2023: Proof of Service by Mail

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/14/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

7/12/2023: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2023
  • Hearing10/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department W at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: TIM GRAYSON as the Successor-in-Interest of CLORIESE S. GRAYSON, deceased (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: TIM GRAYSON as the Successor-in-Interest of CLORIESE S. GRAYSON, deceased (Plaintiff); TIM GRAYSON (Plaintiff); As to: DEANCO HEALTHCARE, LLC, a business entity, form unknown, (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: TIM GRAYSON as the Successor-in-Interest of CLORIESE S. GRAYSON, deceased (Plaintiff); TIM GRAYSON (Plaintiff); As to: DEANCO HEALTHCARE, LLC (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • Docket; Default not entered as to DEANCO HEALTHCARE, LLC, a business entity, form unknown,; On the Complaint filed by TIM GRAYSON as the Successor-in-Interest of CLORIESE S. GRAYSON, deceased, et al. on 01/03/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Entry of Default / Judgment: As To Parties changed from DEANCO HEALTHCARE, LLC, a business entity, form unknown, (Defendant) to DEANCO HEALTHCARE, LLC, a business entity, form unknown, (Defendant) ; Status changed from Filed to Rejected

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: TIM GRAYSON as the Successor-in-Interest of CLORIESE S. GRAYSON, deceased (Plaintiff); TIM GRAYSON (Plaintiff); As to: DEANCO HEALTHCARE, LLC (Defendant); Service Cost: 81.80; Proof of Mailing Date: 04/28/2023; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2023
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: TIM GRAYSON as the Successor-in-Interest of CLORIESE S. GRAYSON, deceased (Plaintiff); CLORIESE S. GRAYSON (Plaintiff); TIM GRAYSON (Plaintiff); As to: MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2023
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: TIM GRAYSON as the Successor-in-Interest of CLORIESE S. GRAYSON, deceased (Plaintiff); CLORIESE S. GRAYSON (Plaintiff); TIM GRAYSON (Plaintiff); As to: DEANCO HEALTHCARE, LLC, a business entity, form unknown, (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
65 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department W Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 01/18/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: TIM GRAYSON as the Successor-in-Interest of CLORIESE S. GRAYSON, deceased (Plaintiff); TIM GRAYSON (Plaintiff); As to: DEANCO HEALTHCARE, LLC (Defendant); MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Virginia Keeny in Department W Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CLORIESE S. GRAYSON (Plaintiff); As to: DEANCO HEALTHCARE, LLC, a business entity, form unknown, (Defendant); MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CLORIESE S. GRAYSON (Plaintiff); As to: DEANCO HEALTHCARE, LLC, a business entity, form unknown, (Defendant); MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CLORIESE S. GRAYSON (Plaintiff); As to: DEANCO HEALTHCARE, LLC, a business entity, form unknown, (Defendant); MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less