This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2022 at 05:04:06 (UTC).

CLONE GODDESS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS STEVE NEMENYI, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 09/21/2021 CLONE GODDESS, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against STEVE NEMENYI, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0731

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CLONE GODDESS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

NEMENYI AN INDIVIDUAL STEVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEGITTINO ESQ TRICIA L

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/23/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/21/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/21/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

9/21/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/21/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Request for Dismissal

9/30/2021: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by CLONE GODDESS, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CLONE GODDESS, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CLONE GODDESS, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CLONE GODDESS, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less