Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/01/2021 at 05:05:11 (UTC).

CLIFFORD R. FELDMAND, MD VS AURORA LAS ENCINAS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/26/2020 CLIFFORD R FELDMAND, MD filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against AURORA LAS ENCINAS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL L. STERN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4203

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL L. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FELDMAND CLIFFORD R. MD

Defendants

SUZUKI DANIEL MD

ASMUS TREVOR

AURORA LAS ENCINAS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SUZUKI DANIEL M.D.

AURORA LAS ENCINAS LLC

SIGNATURE HEALTHCARE SERVICES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SANSANOWICZ LEONARD H.

SANSANOWICZ LEONARD HENRY

Defendant Attorney

RAUCHER STEPHEN LOUIS

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RESOLVING POTENTIAL DEMURRER TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/2/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RESOLVING POTENTIAL DEMURRER TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/16/2021, STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER

2/16/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/16/2021, STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

1/19/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED CO...) OF 01/21/2021

1/21/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED CO...) OF 01/21/2021

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF CLIFFORD R. FELDMAN, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

11/17/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF CLIFFORD R. FELDMAN, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/17/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/18/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Request - REQUEST REQUEST FOR INTERLOCUTORY ORDER RE: APPELLATE RESOLUTION PURSUANT TO CCP 166.1

11/23/2020: Request - REQUEST REQUEST FOR INTERLOCUTORY ORDER RE: APPELLATE RESOLUTION PURSUANT TO CCP 166.1

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE ESTRELLA HERMAN, # 13865

12/2/2020: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE ESTRELLA HERMAN, # 13865

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/3/2020: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

11/3/2020: Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (2ND)

10/8/2020: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (2ND)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

10/8/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENE

9/4/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENE

Proof of Personal Service

7/6/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/6/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/26/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

6/30/2020: Proof of Personal Service

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2021
  • Hearing12/20/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • Hearing12/02/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • Docketat 11:30 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • Docketat 3:22 PM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/16/2021, Final Trial Preparation); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Aurora Las Encinas, LLC (Defendant); Daniel Suzuki, M.D. (Defendant); Trevor Asmus (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • Docketat 10:02 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Stipulation Resolving Potential Demurrer to Th...) of 03/02/2021, Stipulation and Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re Stipulation Resolving Potential Demurrer to Th...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Clifford R. Feldmand, MD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Clifford R. Feldmand, MD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Clifford R. Feldmand, MD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Clifford R. Feldmand, MD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clifford R. Feldmand, MD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Clifford R. Feldmand, MD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Clifford R. Feldmand, MD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AURORA LAS ENCINAS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where SIGNATURE HEALTHCARE SERVICES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAUCHER STEPHEN L.