This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/20/2023 at 01:03:37 (UTC).

CLIFFORD KATAB VS CRAIG KAPLAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/04/2021 CLIFFORD KATAB filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CRAIG KAPLAN,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are YOLANDA OROZCO and MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8803

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

YOLANDA OROZCO

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KATAB CLIFFORD

Defendants

KAPLAN CRAIG

PERFORMANCE TEAM LLC

Not Classified By Court

SHRIVER LESLIE

WIESNER SUSAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HABIB HILARY ANN

KENNEDY TRACEY ADANO

MCCORTNEY RYAN DOUGLAS

YANG YONGQING DOUGLAS

Defendant Attorneys

KIM SYLVIA JIHAE

KANE MATTHEW C.

WERTHEIM MICHAEL A.

BEVERLIN AMY E.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/4/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

5/4/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL DEADLINES TO FACILITATE MEDIATION OF ACTION

3/9/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL DEADLINES TO FACILITATE MEDIATION OF ACTION

Notice - NOTICE AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING REGARDING PLAINTIFF CLIFFORD KATAB'S MOTION TO QUASH FIRST DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS TO LESLIE SHRIVER AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

3/2/2023: Notice - NOTICE AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING REGARDING PLAINTIFF CLIFFORD KATAB'S MOTION TO QUASH FIRST DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS TO LESLIE SHRIVER AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

Notice - NOTICE AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING REGARDING PLAINTIFF CLIFFORD KATAB'S MOTION TO QUASH SECOND DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS TO LESLIE SHRIVER AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

3/2/2023: Notice - NOTICE AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING REGARDING PLAINTIFF CLIFFORD KATAB'S MOTION TO QUASH SECOND DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS TO LESLIE SHRIVER AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

Notice - NOTICE AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING REGARDING PLAINTIFF CLIFFORD KATAB'S MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS TO SUSAN E. WIESNER, ALC, REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS IN

3/2/2023: Notice - NOTICE AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING REGARDING PLAINTIFF CLIFFORD KATAB'S MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS TO SUSAN E. WIESNER, ALC, REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS IN

Notice - NOTICE AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING REGARDING DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

2/17/2023: Notice - NOTICE AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING REGARDING DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION)

2/17/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION)

Notice - NOTICE AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING REGARDING DEFENDANT PERFORMANCE TEAM LLC'S DEMURRERS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

2/17/2023: Notice - NOTICE AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING REGARDING DEFENDANT PERFORMANCE TEAM LLC'S DEMURRERS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION) OF 02/17/2023

2/17/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION) OF 02/17/2023

Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT CRAIG KAPLAN'S AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING REGARDING DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

2/17/2023: Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT CRAIG KAPLAN'S AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING REGARDING DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT PERFORMANCE TEAM LLCS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

2/10/2023: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT PERFORMANCE TEAM LLCS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (2ND)

2/10/2023: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (2ND)

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CRAIG KAPLANS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

2/10/2023: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CRAIG KAPLANS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS PERFORMANCE TEAM LLC AND CRAIG KAPLANS JOINT MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

2/10/2023: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS PERFORMANCE TEAM LLC AND CRAIG KAPLANS JOINT MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF MTQ SECOND DEPOSITION SUBPOENA TO LESLIE SHRIVER

2/8/2023: Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF MTQ SECOND DEPOSITION SUBPOENA TO LESLIE SHRIVER

Response - RESPONSE DEFENDANT RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF SEPARATE STATEMENT ISO MTQ SECOND DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS TO LESLIE SHRIVER

2/8/2023: Response - RESPONSE DEFENDANT RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF SEPARATE STATEMENT ISO MTQ SECOND DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS TO LESLIE SHRIVER

Declaration - DECLARATION OMNIBUS DECLARATION OF AMY E. BEVERLIN BEVERLIN ISO DEFENDANT OPPOSITION

2/7/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OMNIBUS DECLARATION OF AMY E. BEVERLIN BEVERLIN ISO DEFENDANT OPPOSITION

131 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2024
  • Hearing03/25/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2024
  • Hearing03/13/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 31 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2024
  • Hearing01/17/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 31 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2023
  • Hearing10/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoena (to Susan E. Wiesner, ALC)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2023
  • Hearing10/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Quash Second Deposition Subpoena (to Leslie Shriver)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2023
  • Hearing10/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Quash First Deposition Subpoena (to Leslie Shriver)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • Hearing08/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2023
  • Hearing08/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2023
  • Hearing08/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 31 - Hon. Serena R. Murilloeffective 05/08/2023; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
364 More Docket Entries
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice scheduled for 09/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Ryan Douglas McCortney (Attorney): Organization Name changed from Sheppard, Mullin, Richter, ET AL to Sheppard Mullin et al; Middle Name: Douglas

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketAddress for Ryan Douglas McCortney (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 12/03/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Yolanda Orozco in Department 31 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Clifford Katab (Plaintiff); As to: Craig Kaplan (Defendant); Performance Team LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clifford Katab (Plaintiff); As to: Craig Kaplan (Defendant); Performance Team LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Clifford Katab (Plaintiff); As to: Craig Kaplan (Defendant); Performance Team LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: *******8803 Hearing Date: September 14, 2021 Dept: 31

APPLICATION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE IS GRANTED.Background

On August 4, 2021, Plaintiff Clifford Katab, filed the instant action against Defendants Performance Team LLC, Craig Kaplan. and Does 1 through 20. The Complaint asserts causes of action for:

1. Violation of Labor Code—Failure to Pay Earned Bonuses;

2. Violation of Labor Code—Failure to Pay Accrued Vacation;

3. Breach of Contract—Employment Agreement;

4. Breach of Contract—Retention Agreement;

5. Money Had and Received; and

6. Declaratory and Injunctive Relief.

Plaintiff Clifford Katab (hereinafter “Plaintiff”) now moves for Counsel Connie N. Bertram to be admitted to this court pro hac vice.

Legal Standard on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

California Rules of Court Rule 9.40 provides that an attorney in good standing in another jurisdiction may apply to appear pro hac vice in this State by way of written application upon notice by mail to all interested parties, as well as service on the State Bar in San Francisco with payment of a $50.00 fee, so long as that attorney is not a resident of California, does not work in California, and does not perform regular or substantial business, professional, or other activities in the State. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 9.40.)

The written application must provide the following information: (1) applicant attorney’s residence and office addresses; (2) the courts to which the applicant attorney has been admitted and dates of admission; (3) representation that the attorney applicant is a member in good standing in the courts of admission and is not currently suspended or disbarred in any court; (4) the title of each court and action in which the applicant attorney has appeared pro hac vice in this State in the preceding two years, if any; and (5) the name, address, and telephone number of the active California State Bar member who is counsel of record in the local action. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 9.40(d).)

Discussion

A. Procedural Compliance

There is nothing before the Court to indicate the application should not be granted. Based on the application and the attached declaration, Counsel Connie N. Bertram is not employed or residing within California (Bertram Decl. ¶¶ 1, 3); the attorney has not been admitted to another court within the past two years (Bertram Decl. ¶ 9); the applications contain the necessary addresses (Bertram Decl. ¶¶ 1, 3); the application has the proper admission information for other courts where the attorney is admitted (Bertram Decl. ¶ 4); and the attorney is in good standing (Bertram Decl. ¶¶ 5-6). (See Cal. Rules of Ct. rule 9.40.) The fee to the State Bar was also paid. (See McCortney Decl. ¶ 5, Exh. A.) Counsel Bertram is to be associated with local counsel, Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton, LLP. (Bertram Decl. ¶ 7.)

Accordingly, the Court grants Plaintiff’s motion for Counsel Bertram to be admitted pro hac vice.

Conclusion

The Court GRANTS Plaintiff’s motion and application for admission of Connie N. Bertram pro hac vice.

Plaintiff is to give notice.

The parties are strongly encouraged to attend all scheduled hearings virtually or by audio. Effective July 20, 2020, all matters will be scheduled virtually and/or with audio through the Court’s LACourtConnect technology. The parties are strongly encouraged to use LACourtConnect for all their matters. All masking protocols will be observed at the Courthouse and in the courtrooms.

'