This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/11/2022 at 09:41:35 (UTC).

CLIFF ARMSTRONG VS MAKITA U.S.A., INC.

Case Summary

On 05/10/2021 CLIFF ARMSTRONG filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against MAKITA U S A , INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELIHU M. BERLE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7592

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELIHU M. BERLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARMSTRONG CLIFF

Defendant

MAKITA U.S.A. INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KAZEROUNIAN SEYED ABBAS

ASSASSI ADIB HASHEMI

PRESCOTT PAMELA ERIN

Defendant Attorney

TARVIN NATHANIEL JAMES

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

1/7/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice of Settlement - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

1/7/2022: Notice of Settlement - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

Substitution of Attorney

2/8/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Declaration - DECLARATION OF PAMELA E. PRESCOTT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC 3.770(C)

3/1/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF PAMELA E. PRESCOTT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC 3.770(C)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE

3/1/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE

Request for Dismissal - PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ACTION PURSUANT TO CRC 3.770(C)

3/1/2022: Request for Dismissal - PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ACTION PURSUANT TO CRC 3.770(C)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

3/16/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE TO DEFENDANT OF OUTCOME OF MARCH 16, 2022 STATUS CONFERENCE

3/16/2022: Notice - NOTICE TO DEFENDANT OF OUTCOME OF MARCH 16, 2022 STATUS CONFERENCE

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/16/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

4/5/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Order - ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ACTION PURSUANT TO CRC 3.770(C)

4/5/2022: Order - ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ACTION PURSUANT TO CRC 3.770(C)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE BRIEFING SCHEDULE; AND ORDER THEREON

12/16/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE BRIEFING SCHEDULE; AND ORDER THEREON

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

11/2/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Opposition - PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO THE FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT

11/2/2021: Opposition - PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO THE FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT

Reply - MAKITA U.S.A., INC.'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

11/16/2021: Reply - MAKITA U.S.A., INC.'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)

12/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12/2/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12/10/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketOrder Granting Plaintiff?s Unopposed Request For Dismissal Of Action Pursuant To CRC 3.770(C); Filed by Cliff Armstrong (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Status Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketNotice (to Defendant of Outcome of March 16, 2022 Status Conference); Filed by Cliff Armstrong (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Cliff Armstrong (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Cliff Armstrong (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Unopposed Request for Dismissal of Action Pursuant to CRC 3.770(C); Filed by Cliff Armstrong (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Of Pamela E. Prescott In Support Of Plaintiff?s Unopposed Request For Dismissal Pursuant To Crc 3.770(C); Filed by Cliff Armstrong (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Filed by Makita U.S.A., Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Cliff Armstrong (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • Docketat 3:57 PM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Initial Status Conference Order) of 06/09/2021, Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Initial Status Conference Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Cliff Armstrong (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Cliff Armstrong (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MAKITA U.S.A. LNC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tarvin, Nathaniel J