Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/07/2021 at 01:38:44 (UTC).

CLIENT CLASSIFIER, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS RAUL YANEZ LEPE, INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/12/2019 CLIENT CLASSIFIER, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against RAUL YANEZ LEPE, INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0686

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CLIENT CLASSIFIER INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

LEPE RAUL YANEZ INDIVIDUAL

PENA AUDELIA ELIZABETH INDIVIDUAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRIFMAN MARK

 

Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/29/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Mail

4/2/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

4/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

2/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

11/2/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

9/1/2020: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/2/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/20/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: ADVANCEMENT)

4/22/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: ADVANCEMENT)

Declaration re: Due Diligence

3/5/2020: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Proof of Service by Mail

3/5/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/9/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

1/2/2020: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/8/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/12/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/12/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/12/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

9/12/2019: Complaint

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2021
  • Hearing06/07/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Order to Show Cause Re: Default and Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15, Wendy Chang, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Default and Default Judgment) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Default and Default Judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Client Classifier, Inc., A California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15, Wendy Chang, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Default and Default Judgment) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Default and Default Judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment ((Not Entered)); Filed by Client Classifier, Inc., A California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15, Wendy Chang, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by Client Classifier, Inc., A California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Client Classifier, Inc., A California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15, Wendy Chang, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Client Classifier, Inc., A California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Client Classifier, Inc., A California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Client Classifier, Inc., A California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Client Classifier, Inc., A California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CLIENT CLASSIFIER INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant