Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/23/2021 at 16:01:17 (UTC).

CLIENT CLASSIFIER, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS BLOOD SWEAT & TEARS LLC, A BUSINESS ORGANIZATION FORM AND JURISDICTION UNKNOWN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/01/2019 CLIENT CLASSIFIER, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BLOOD SWEAT TEARS LLC, A BUSINESS ORGANIZATION FORM AND JURISDICTION UNKNOWN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MEL RED RECANA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9587

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MEL RED RECANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

CLIENT CLASSIFIER INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

POZO GILMORE

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

SANTORO MARINA GAIL INDIVIDUAL

SANTORO JOHN INDIVIDUAL

FINLEY GILBERT INDIVIDUAL

BLOOD SWEAT & TEARS LLC A BUSINESS ORGANIZATION FORM AND JURISDICTION UNKNOWN

BLOOD SWEAT & TEARS BST CONSTRUCTION INC. AKA BST CONSTRUCTION & RESTORATION

BLOOD SWEAT & TEARS BST CONSTRUCTION INC. AKA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant, Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

BRIFMAN MARK

 

Court Documents

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

3/26/2021: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/8/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/5/2021: Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice - NOTICE OF OSC AND CMC HEARINGS HELD

2/9/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF OSC AND CMC HEARINGS HELD

Trial Brief

2/9/2021: Trial Brief

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STRIKING ...)

12/4/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STRIKING ...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/24/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

7/6/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/16/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Answer

1/22/2020: Answer

Answer

1/23/2020: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/23/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

1/30/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/30/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/27/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

12/3/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/1/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/1/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2021
  • Hearing04/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Client Classifier, Inc., A California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Status Conference (ReDefault Judgment) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by Client Classifier, Inc., A California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Status Conference (ReDefault Judgment) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Default Prove Up Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Default Prove Up Hearing)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNotice (of OSC and CMC hearings held); Filed by Client Classifier, Inc., A California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Gilbert Finley, individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Gilbert Finley, individual (Defendant); John Santoro, individual (Defendant); Marina Gail Santoro, individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Gilbert Finley, individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Blood Sweat & Tears LLC, a business organization form and jurisdiction unknown (Defendant); Gilbert Finley, individual (Defendant); John Santoro, individual (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Client Classifier, Inc., A California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Client Classifier, Inc., A California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Client Classifier, Inc., A California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Client Classifier, Inc., A California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CLIENT CLASSIFIER INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where BLOOD SWEAT & TEARS BST CONSTRUCTION INC. AKA BST CONSTRUCTION & RESTORATION is a litigant