Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/22/2019 at 00:21:23 (UTC).

CLIENT CLASSIER INC. VS. LENNIE D. SIMS

Case Summary

On 09/05/2017 CLIENT CLASSIER INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LENNIE D SIMS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MELVIN D. SANDVIG. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7970

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MELVIN D. SANDVIG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

CLIENT CLASSIFIER INC.

Defendant and Appellant

SIMS LENNIE D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF AARON BERGER

Defendant Attorney

HALIMI GEORGE M.

 

Court Documents

Unknown

9/5/2017: Unknown

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/5/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons

9/5/2017: Summons

Unknown

2/21/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

3/20/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

6/28/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

7/13/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

7/17/2018: Notice of Ruling

Declaration

8/15/2018: Declaration

Request for Dismissal

8/15/2018: Request for Dismissal

Unknown

10/16/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

1/24/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/21/2019: Minute Order

Proof of Service by Mail

5/20/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

5/21/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Unknown

6/19/2019: Unknown

Unknown

6/19/2019: Unknown

Unknown

6/19/2019: Unknown

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2019
  • Appeal - Notice of Default Issued; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal ("AMENDED"); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal (NOA:05/20/19 B297825); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed; Filed by LENNIE D. SIMS (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by LENNIE D. SIMS (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • Judgment on Verdict in Open Court; Filed by CLIENT CLASSIFIER INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • Order ((Proposed)); Filed by CLIENT CLASSIFIER INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by CLIENT CLASSIFIER INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 10/24/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by LENNIE D. SIMS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by LENNIE D. SIMS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by CLIENT CLASSIFIER INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by CLIENT CLASSIFIER INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Notice of Lis Pendens; Filed by CLIENT CLASSIFIER INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CLIENT CLASSIFIER INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Notice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CLIENT CLASSIFIER INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HALIMI GEORGE MAYER