This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/03/2022 at 14:00:36 (UTC).

CLETRO, TERRI - CONSERVATORSHIP

Case Summary

On 01/27/2022 CLETRO, TERRI - CONSERVATORSHIP was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SMALL, MICHAEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0789

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SMALL, MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CLETRO-JOHNSON DIANE

Conservator

THOMAS SAMUEL

Not Classified By Court

CLETRO TERRI

PASADENA CARE CENTER LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ARTIS TAB L

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

STEWART CHARISE L.

HAMASSIAN MARIA S.

 

Court Documents

Report - Court Appointed Counsel - Report Court Appointed Counsel

2/1/2022: Report - Court Appointed Counsel - Report Court Appointed Counsel

Notice - Death

2/1/2022: Notice - Death

PR_General Probate - PR-Appointment Order Professional Appointee Court Expense -

1/28/2022: PR_General Probate - PR-Appointment Order Professional Appointee Court Expense -

Order - Appointing Counsel

1/28/2022: Order - Appointing Counsel

Petition - Appoint a Temporary Conservator (Subsequent)

1/27/2022: Petition - Appoint a Temporary Conservator (Subsequent)

Doctor's Capacity Declaration

1/27/2022: Doctor's Capacity Declaration

Petition - Appoint Conservator of P&E (Initial)

1/27/2022: Petition - Appoint Conservator of P&E (Initial)

Citation - Citation Permanent (ISSUED)

1/27/2022: Citation - Citation Permanent (ISSUED)

Citation - Citation Temporary (ISSUED)

1/27/2022: Citation - Citation Temporary (ISSUED)

Minute Order

2/4/2022: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/13/2022: Minute Order

PR_General Probate - PR-Notice- Rejection

5/6/2022: PR_General Probate - PR-Notice- Rejection

Creditor's Claim - Creditor???s Claim

6/28/2022: Creditor's Claim - Creditor???s Claim

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketCreditor's Claim (Creditor???s Claim ); Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 5, Small, Michael, Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Conservator - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketPetition Denied (Petition - Appoint Conservator of P&E (Initial) filed on January 27, 2022 by Diane Cletro-Johnson. )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 5, Small, Michael, Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Temp Conservatorship - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketPetition Denied (The Petition - Appoint a Temporary Conservator (Subsequent) filed on 1/27/2022 by Petitioner(s) Diane Cletro-Johnson )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketNotice - Death; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketReport - Court Appointed Counsel (Report Court Appointed Counsel ); Filed by Subject

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketPetition - Appoint a Temporary Conservator (Subsequent); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketConfidential Supplemental Info Sheet; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketPetition - Appoint Conservator of P&E (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketDoctor's Capacity Declaration; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketCitation (Citation Temporary (ISSUED) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketCAC Appointment Required

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketCitation (Citation Permanent (ISSUED) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketConfidential Screening Form; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ARTIS TAB L. ESQ.