This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/09/2019 at 04:47:03 (UTC).

CLEMENTINA SANCHEZ VS KATERRA INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/15/2017 CLEMENTINA SANCHEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against KATERRA INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3934

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANCHEZ CLEMENTINA

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

KATERRA INC.

CARSON CITY OF

KATERRA CONSTRUCTION LLC

POWELL CONSTRUCTORS INC

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY

ANDERSONPENNA PARTNERS INC.

Cross Defendants and Defendants

KATERRA CONSTRUCTION LLC

POWELL CONSTRUCTORS INC

ANDERSONPENNA PARTNERS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ARIAS JANETH

Defendant Attorneys

WILLIAMS CRANSTON J. ESQ.

ALESHIRE & WYNDER LLP

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

TUCKER GLEN EDWARD

Cross Defendant Attorneys

PETERSEN MARK

SMITH SEAN E

 

Court Documents

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF KATERRA CONSTRUCTION, LLC FOR: TOTAL IMPLIED EQUITABLE INDEITY; ETC

2/1/2018: CROSS-COMPLAINT OF KATERRA CONSTRUCTION, LLC FOR: TOTAL IMPLIED EQUITABLE INDEITY; ETC

KTERRA CONSTRUCTION, LLC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

2/1/2018: KTERRA CONSTRUCTION, LLC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

2/1/2018: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

2/5/2018: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Amended Complaint

2/27/2018: Amended Complaint

Summons

3/1/2018: Summons

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

4/5/2018: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY TO PLAINTIFF CLEMENTINA SANCHEZ'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/18/2018: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY TO PLAINTIFF CLEMENTINA SANCHEZ'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

KATERRA CONSTRUCTION, LLC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/19/2018: KATERRA CONSTRUCTION, LLC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT, CITY OF CARSON'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF CLEMENTINA SANCHEZ'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

4/19/2018: DEFENDANT, CITY OF CARSON'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF CLEMENTINA SANCHEZ'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

Amendment to Cross-Complaint

9/13/2018: Amendment to Cross-Complaint

DECLARATION OF SALVADOR RODRIGUEZ IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

9/21/2018: DECLARATION OF SALVADOR RODRIGUEZ IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

DECLARATION OF ROBERTO J. BASTIDAS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

9/21/2018: DECLARATION OF ROBERTO J. BASTIDAS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

DECLARATION OF JOO EUN KIM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

9/21/2018: DECLARATION OF JOO EUN KIM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

9/21/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

9/21/2018: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Request for Dismissal

11/7/2018: Request for Dismissal

Unknown

11/14/2018: Unknown

57 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Carson, City of (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Clementina Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by ANDERSONPENNA PARTNERS, INC., a California Corporation (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketCertificate ( OF MERIT); Filed by Carson, City of (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Clementina Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Ruling on Submitted Matter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 03/08/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
80 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Clementina Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons and Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Clementina Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Clementina Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Clementina Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****3934    Hearing Date: December 16, 2019    Dept: 5

Clementina Sanchez v. Katerra, Inc., et al.

Case No. ****3934

This case is being transferred to an Independent Calendar court.  Therefore, the ex parte application will be denied as moot.  This order is without prejudice to re-raising the issues if necessary.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Katerra Construction LLC Jointly Administered under 21-31861. is a litigant

Latest cases where Katerra Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where POWELL CONSTRUCTORS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CARSON CITY OF is a litigant