This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 15:09:40 (UTC).

CLEARPATH FEDERAL CREDIT UNION VS. HAKOP ARABAJYAN, ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/21/2018 CLEARPATH FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HAKOP ARABAJYAN,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9409

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CLEARPATH FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendants

JJ'S AUTO RESTORATION INC. A CALIFORNIA

ARABAJYAN HAKOP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NEEDLEMAN BRUCE PAUL

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

1/31/2019: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for

12/27/2018: Certificate of Mailing for

Minute Order

12/27/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

12/10/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

11/20/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Declaration

10/4/2018: Declaration

Declaration

10/1/2018: Declaration

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/21/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice

9/21/2018: Notice

Summons

9/21/2018: Summons

Complaint

9/21/2018: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/21/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Clearpath Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • Docketat 09:54 AM in Department B; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 12/27/2018); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service of t...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Clearpath Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketSummons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by Clearpath Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Clearpath Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketNotice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CLEARPATH FEDERAL CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Needleman, Bruce P.