Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/06/2021 at 00:51:12 (UTC).

CLEAR RECON CORP VS ALL CLAIMANTS TO SURPLUS FUNDS AT 1508 STANLEY AVENUE LONG BEACH, CA 90804

Case Summary

On 04/08/2021 CLEAR RECON CORP filed an Other lawsuit against ALL CLAIMANTS TO SURPLUS FUNDS AT 1508 STANLEY AVENUE LONG BEACH, CA 90804. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL L. STERN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1054

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL L. STERN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CLEAR RECON CORP

Respondent

ALL CLAIMANTS TO SURPLUS FUNDS AT 1508 STANLEY AVENUE LONG BEACH CA 90804

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

RANKIN CASPER J.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

6/4/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE) OF 06/04/2021

6/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE) OF 06/04/2021

Proof of Service by Mail

4/23/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

4/8/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/8/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds - PETITION AND DECLARATION REGARDING UNRESOLVED CLAIMS AND DEPOSIT OF UNDISTRIBUTED SURPLUS PROCEEDS

4/8/2021: Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds - PETITION AND DECLARATION REGARDING UNRESOLVED CLAIMS AND DEPOSIT OF UNDISTRIBUTED SURPLUS PROCEEDS

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF PETITION TO SUPERIOR COURT TO DEPOSIT SURPLUS FUNDS

4/8/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF PETITION TO SUPERIOR COURT TO DEPOSIT SURPLUS FUNDS

Memorandum - MEMORANDUM MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

4/8/2021: Memorandum - MEMORANDUM MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2021
  • Hearing07/27/2021 at 10:45 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • Hearing07/27/2021 at 10:45 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service) of 06/04/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Clear Recon Corp (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Clear Recon Corp (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Petition to Superior Court to Deposit Surplus Funds); Filed by Clear Recon Corp (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketMemorandum (Memorandum of Points and Authorities); Filed by Clear Recon Corp (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketPetition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee's Sale; Filed by Clear Recon Corp (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Clear Recon Corp is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RANKIN, CASPER J.