Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/16/2021 at 03:20:56 (UTC).

CLEAR RECON CORP VS ADLINE C. ONYENWE

Case Summary

On 03/12/2021 CLEAR RECON CORP filed an Other lawsuit against ADLINE C ONYENWE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0813

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CLEAR RECON CORP

Claimant

MILLENIUM PROPERTIES INC.

Respondent

ADLINE C. ONYENWE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

RANKIN CASPER JOHN

WEST JOSEPH A.

 

Court Documents

Response - RESPONSE CLEAR RECON CORP'S RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PROOF OF SERVICE

7/8/2021: Response - RESPONSE CLEAR RECON CORP'S RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PROOF OF SERVICE

Proof of Service by Mail

6/4/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Response to Petition

4/7/2021: Response to Petition

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

3/18/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF PETITION TO SUPERIOR COURT TO DEPOSIT SURPLUS FUNDS

3/12/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF PETITION TO SUPERIOR COURT TO DEPOSIT SURPLUS FUNDS

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds - PETITION AND DECLARATION REGARDING UNRESOLVED CLAIMS AND DEPOSIT OF UNDISTRIBUTED SURPLUS PROCEEDS

3/12/2021: Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds - PETITION AND DECLARATION REGARDING UNRESOLVED CLAIMS AND DEPOSIT OF UNDISTRIBUTED SURPLUS PROCEEDS

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Memorandum - MEMORANDUM MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF ALLOWING DEPOSIT OF SURPLUS FUNDS

3/12/2021: Memorandum - MEMORANDUM MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF ALLOWING DEPOSIT OF SURPLUS FUNDS

Proof of Service by Mail

3/15/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2021
  • Hearing07/16/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketResponse (Clear Recon Corp's Response to Order to Show Cause Re Proof of Service); Filed by Clear Recon Corp (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Clear Recon Corp (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketResponse to Petition; Filed by Millenium Properties Inc. (Claimant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Clear Recon Corp (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketMemorandum (Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Allowing Deposit of Surplus Funds); Filed by Clear Recon Corp (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Clear Recon Corp (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Petition to Superior Court to Deposit Surplus Funds); Filed by Clear Recon Corp (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketPetition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee's Sale; Filed by Clear Recon Corp (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MILLENIUM PROPERTIES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Clear Recon Corp is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RANKIN, CASPER J.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEST JOSEPH A. ESQ.