Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/08/2017 at 05:43:14 (UTC).

CLAUDIA VEGA VS ALVINO HERNANDEZ

Case Summary

On 07/19/2017 CLAUDIA VEGA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALVINO HERNANDEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9121

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

VEGA CLAUDIA

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 30

HERNANDEZ ALVINO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SOUTHWEST LEGAL GROUP

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

10/26/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

7/19/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

SUMMONS

7/19/2017: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/2/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2017
  • Request and Entry of Dismissal (ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less