This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/09/2022 at 00:35:59 (UTC).

CLAUDIA RITA MOREIRA VS CALIFORNIA INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 CLAUDIA RITA MOREIRA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CALIFORNIA INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1792

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOREIRA CLAUDIA RITA

Defendant

CALIFORNIA INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KALRA GAURAV BOBBY

Defendant Attorney

SUGDEN DAVID RICHARD

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/18/2022: Complaint

Request for Dismissal

9/9/2022: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

8/15/2022: Notice of Settlement - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

8/15/2022: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice of Ruling

7/22/2022: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

7/6/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/25/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/18/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

5/11/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

5/16/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/16/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

3/21/2022: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/21/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/18/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/18/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/18/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/18/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

1/18/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 09/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 48 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/12/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Stay - Conditional Settlement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by CLAUDIA RITA MOREIRA on 01/18/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by CLAUDIA RITA MOREIRA as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: CLAUDIA RITA MOREIRA (Plaintiff); As to: CALIFORNIA INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Settlement of Entire Case; Filed by: CLAUDIA RITA MOREIRA (Plaintiff); As to: CALIFORNIA INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY (Defendant); Vacate Future Dates: Yes; Settlement Type: Conditional; OSC re: Dismissal Date: 09/30/2022; OSC re: Dismissal Time: 0830a; Set Hearing and Generate Notice?: Yes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 09/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 48

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 09/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 48

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Conditional Settlement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 48 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Laura A. Seigle in Department 48 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketAddress for Gaurav Bobby Kalra (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CLAUDIA RITA MOREIRA (Plaintiff); As to: CALIFORNIA INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 48

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 48

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KALRA GAURAV BOBBY