This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/25/2023 at 08:53:11 (UTC).

CLAUDIA MENDOZA VS DAVID BEVERLY

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 CLAUDIA MENDOZA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DAVID BEVERLY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2534

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MENDOZA CLAUDIA

Defendant

BEVERLY DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KARIMIAN SHAHIN

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/2/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

12/2/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/2/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/2/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

12/5/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/5/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2023
  • Hearing04/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Craig D. Karlan in Department N Santa Monica Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Claudia Mendoza (Plaintiff); As to: David Beverly (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Claudia Mendoza (Plaintiff); As to: David Beverly (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Claudia Mendoza (Plaintiff); As to: David Beverly (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less