This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/03/2020 at 06:49:53 (UTC).

CLAUDIA HERNANDEZ ET AL VS CAROLYN M LOBO MD ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/01/2017 CLAUDIA HERNANDEZ filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against CAROLYN M LOBO MD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARC D. GROSS, JON R. TAKASUGI, HOLLY E. KENDIG, THOMAS D. LONG and MELVIN D. SANDVIG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5192

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARC D. GROSS

JON R. TAKASUGI

HOLLY E. KENDIG

THOMAS D. LONG

MELVIN D. SANDVIG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

HERNANDEZ CLAUDIA

REYES HERIBERTO

Defendants and Respondents

LOBO CAROLYN M. M.D.

ROTH BRADLEY J. M.D.

DOES 1 TO 20

PROVIDENCE HOLY CROSS MED. CTR. (DOE 1)

PROVIDENCE HOLY CROSS MED. CTR. DOE 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF MIFFLINE AND ASSCOCIATES

MIFFLIN KEN

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

WEND CHRISTOPHER P. ESQ.

KELLY JOHN C. ESQ.

KELLY JOHN CHRISTOPHER ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

8/10/2020: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE SUSPENDING TRIAL (TSC))

5/19/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE SUSPENDING TRIAL (TSC))

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER CONTINUING/VACATING HEARING(S)) OF 04/14/2020

4/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER CONTINUING/VACATING HEARING(S)) OF 04/14/2020

Response - RESPONSE RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S ADDITIONAL UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS

2/20/2020: Response - RESPONSE RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S ADDITIONAL UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS

Notice - NOTICE ADDENDUM TO RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S ADDITIONAL UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS

2/21/2020: Notice - NOTICE ADDENDUM TO RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S ADDITIONAL UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; HEARING ON MOTION TO ...)

2/26/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; HEARING ON MOTION TO ...)

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ARA KESHISHIAN, M.D. IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CAROLYN MARY LOBO, M.D. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

2/13/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ARA KESHISHIAN, M.D. IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CAROLYN MARY LOBO, M.D. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Objection - OBJECTION EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF CAROLYN MARY LOBO, M.D. FILED IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CAROLYN MARY LOBO, M.D.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

2/13/2020: Objection - OBJECTION EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF CAROLYN MARY LOBO, M.D. FILED IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CAROLYN MARY LOBO, M.D.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

10/16/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Motion for Summary Judgment

8/21/2019: Motion for Summary Judgment

Judgment - JUDGMENT ON SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO BRADLEY J. ROTH MD AND AGAINST PLAINTIFF

8/23/2019: Judgment - JUDGMENT ON SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO BRADLEY J. ROTH MD AND AGAINST PLAINTIFF

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT) OF 04/22/2019

4/22/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT) OF 04/22/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)

4/22/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

4/4/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Declaration - Declaration DECLARATION OF FALLAS MD

2/5/2019: Declaration - Declaration DECLARATION OF FALLAS MD

Notice of Deposit - Jury

1/9/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/7/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

DEMAND THAT DEFENSE OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS BE TRIED SEPARATELY CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE597.5

5/2/2018: DEMAND THAT DEFENSE OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS BE TRIED SEPARATELY CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE597.5

88 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F47, Melvin D. Sandvig, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by CAROLYN M. M.D. LOBO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by CLAUDIA HERNANDEZ (Plaintiff); HERIBERTO REYES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F47, Melvin D. Sandvig, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (OF CAROLYN M. LOBO M.D.) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F47, Melvin D. Sandvig, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Bifurcate - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Taking Motion Off Calendar); Filed by CAROLYN M. M.D. LOBO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by CLAUDIA HERNANDEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F47, Melvin D. Sandvig, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (Re Suspending Trial (TSC)) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department ; Non-Appearance Case Review (Re Suspending Trial (TSC))

    Read MoreRead Less
129 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by BRADLEY J. M.D. ROTH (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketANSWER OF DEFENDANT BRADLEY J. ROTH, M.D. TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketFW-001 Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by CLAUDIA HERNANDEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketFW-001 Request to Waive Court Costs; Filed by HERIBERTO REYES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CLAUDIA HERNANDEZ (Plaintiff); HERIBERTO REYES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CLAUDIA HERNANDEZ (Plaintiff); HERIBERTO REYES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES MEDICAL MALPRACTICE AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC685192    Hearing Date: February 26, 2020    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES – CENTRAL DISTRICT

CLAUDIA HERNANDEZ, ET AL.,

CAROLYN M. LOBO, M.D., ET AL.,

Case No.:  BC685192

ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

AFTER REVIEW OF THE COURT FILE, THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING ORDER:

Department 31 of the Personal Injury Court has determined that the above entitled action is complicated based upon the number of pretrial hearings and/or the complexity of the issues presented. 

AT THE DIRECTION OF DEPARTMENT 1:

This case is hereby transferred and reassigned to the following Independent Calendar Court in THE NORTH VALLEY DISTRICT, JUDGE MELVIN D. SANDVIG presiding in DEPT. F47 of the Chatsworth Courthouse, for all purposes except trial. Department 1 hereby delegates to the Independent Calendar Court the authority to assign the cause for trial to that Independent Calendar Court.  

The Order is signed and filed this date, and incorporated herein by reference.  Any pending motions or hearings, including trial and status conferences, will be reset, continued or vacated at the direction of the newly assigned Independent Calendar court.

UPON RECEIPT OF THIS NOTICE, COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF SHALL GIVE NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES OF RECORD.

DATED: February 26, 2020 ___________________________