Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/23/2019 at 10:36:17 (UTC).

CLAUDIA DRAPER VS. ESTHER GUZMAN

Case Summary

On 01/17/2018 CLAUDIA DRAPER filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ESTHER GUZMAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARGARET MILLER BERNAL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6856

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARGARET MILLER BERNAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DRAPER CLAUDIA AN INDIVIDUAL

GUZMAN CLAUDIA

DRAPER CLAUDIA AKA CLAUDIA DRAPER

Defendants

GUZMAN ESTHER AN INDIVIDUAL

GUZMAN ESTHER

Cross Plaintiff

GUZMAN SALVADOR

Cross Defendants

DRAPER STEVEN L.

VASQUEZ CASSANDRA X.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GOMEZ & SIMONE APLC

GOMEZ MARK ANDRES JR

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

STEPONOVICH & ASSOCIATES

STEPONOVICH MICHAEL JOHN JR

 

Court Documents

Notice

10/5/2018: Notice

Minute Order

11/19/2018: Minute Order

Other -

7/12/2018: Other -

Amendment to Cross-Complaint

7/25/2018: Amendment to Cross-Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2018
  • at 00:00 AM in Department F, Margaret Miller Bernal, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Notice (OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT, ESTHER GUZMAN); Filed by CLAUDIA DRAPER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • at 09:00 AM in Department E; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department F; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) (Mandatory Settlement Conference; Transferred to different departmnt) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-10-03 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-10-03 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • Amendment to Cross Complaint (Incorrect Name)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • Answer to Amended Cross-Complaint; Filed by CLAUDIA DRAPER (Plaintiff); STEVEN L. DRAPER (Cross-Defendant); CASSANDRA X. VASQUEZ (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • at 1:30 PM in Department F; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Trial and MSC Set) -

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/27/2018
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by CLAUDIA GUZMAN (Legacy Party); CLAUDIA DRAPER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by CLAUDIA GUZMAN (Legacy Party); CLAUDIA DRAPER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • Cross-Compl fld - Summons Issued; Filed by SALVADOR GUZMAN (Cross-Complainant); ESTHER GUZMAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • Answer; Filed by ESTHER GUZMAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • Summons; Filed by SALVADOR GUZMAN (Cross-Complainant); ESTHER GUZMAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Notice; Filed by ESTHER GUZMAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by CLAUDIA GUZMAN (Legacy Party); CLAUDIA DRAPER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • Summons; Filed by CLAUDIA DRAPER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by CLAUDIA GUZMAN (Legacy Party); CLAUDIA DRAPER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: VC066856    Hearing Date: November 27, 2019    Dept: C

DRAPER v. GUZMAN

CASE NO.: VC066856

HEARING: 11/27/19

#14

TENTATIVE ORDER

  1. PETER ROBLE, ESQ. of Gomez & Simone, A Professional Law Corporation’s unopposed motion to withdraw as counsel of record for Plaintiff CLAUDIA DRAPER is GRANTED. (C.R.C. 3.1362.)

  1. PETER ROBLE, ESQ. of Gomez & Simone, A Professional Law Corporation’s unopposed motion to withdraw as counsel of record for Cross-Defendant STEVEN L. DRAPER is GRANTED. (C.R.C. 3.1362.)

  1. PETER ROBLE, ESQ. of Gomez & Simone, A Professional Law Corporation’s unopposed motion to withdraw as counsel of record for Cross-Defendant CASSANDRA X. VASQUEZ is GRANTED. (C.R.C. 3.1362.)

Moving Party to give Notice.

No Opposition(s) filed as of November 25, 2019.

The Court finds that Counsel has met the procedural requirements, including proper notice to the clients at the last known residence(s) or business address(es) of the clients. C.R.C. 3.1362.

Here, Counsel’s declarations indicate that “[a]n irreparable breakdown of attorney-client relationship has occurred that makes it impossible for attorney to represent this client.” Where the issue (or conflict) is between the lawyer and client, without implicating other parties, the court can rely on counsel’s sworn declaration absent any reason to doubt the representations.

The next hearing is an Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal set for Monday, October 4, 2021 at 8:30 a.m. in Dept. SE-F. No Oppositions have been filed as of November 25, 2019, and there is an undisputed breakdown in attorney-client communications. It does not appear that Attorney Roble’s continued representation would serve the interests of justice. Counsel’s motions to withdraw are granted.