This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/22/2022 at 05:04:09 (UTC).

CLAUDIA DE GASPERIS VS BRANDI N RITCHIES

Case Summary

On 11/13/2020 CLAUDIA DE GASPERIS filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BRANDI N RITCHIES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3516

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DE GASPERIS CLAUDIA

Defendant

RITCHIES BRANDI N

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

POURMORADY KOUROSH MYER

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

6/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE; C...)

7/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE; C...)

Application for Publication

8/4/2021: Application for Publication

Order for Publication - ORDER FOR PUBLICATION FOR BRANDI

8/10/2021: Order for Publication - ORDER FOR PUBLICATION FOR BRANDI

Proof of Publication

9/17/2021: Proof of Publication

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

9/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Request for Dismissal

11/3/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/3/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

11/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Default Judgment

12/14/2021: Default Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARING)

12/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARING)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARING) OF 12/14/2021, DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF THE COURT

12/14/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARING) OF 12/14/2021, DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF THE COURT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

5/4/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

3/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

3/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...) OF 03/16/2021

3/16/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...) OF 03/16/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

3/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AS T...)

1/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AS T...)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding; Default Prove Up Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Default Prove Up Hearing)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by Claudia De Gasperis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketJudgment (- Default Judgment By Court - After Court Trial - 12/14/2021 entered for Plaintiff Claudia De Gasperis against Defendant Brandi N Ritchies.); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Default Prove Up Hearing) of 12/14/2021, Default Judgment of the Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Claudia De Gasperis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Claudia De Gasperis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (As To All Named Defendants) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (As To All Named Defendants) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service As T...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Claudia De Gasperis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Claudia De Gasperis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Claudia De Gasperis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer POURMORADY KOUROSH M.