This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/18/2023 at 01:58:09 (UTC).

CLAUDIA ANN SMITH, VS AVON PRODUCTS, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/07/2022 CLAUDIA ANN SMITH, filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against AVON PRODUCTS, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8719

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SMITH CLAUDIA ANN

Defendants

AVON PRODUCTS INC.

BAYER CONSUMER CARE HOLDINGS LLC FKA BAYER CONSUMER CARE LLC FKA MSD CONSUMER CARE INC. AND BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC A SUBSIDIARY OF BAYER AG

BEN NYE CO. INC.

CONOPCO INC.

COTY INC.

DORSETT & JACKSON INC.

ESTEE LAUDER COMPANIES INC.

FEDERATED DEPARTMENT STORES INC.

LONGS DRUG STORES CALIFORNIA L.L.C.

MACYS INC.

MARY KAY INC.

MAYBELLINE LLC

PFIZER INC.

PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

REVLON INC.

RITE AID CORPORATION

SHULTON INC.

UNILEVER PLC

VANDERBILT MINERALS LLC

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

AMELL DAVID L.

RANCILIO DAVID

Defendant Attorneys

BEAL HOLLY C.

CHANG STEPHANIE C.

CACHAN MANUEL FRANCISCO

SACHS MICHAEL B.

GALDO DOROTHEA S.

GIAQUINTO MICHAEL

GRANT SCOTT S

KO SANDRA MEEYOUN

LANGBORD PETER BENNETT

KAPLAN BRADLEY P.

KHARE VIIU SPANGLER

MEDRANO MELISSA M.

STRUNK CHRISTOPHER DANIEL

MEAK VANTHARA

LEWIS SHAWTINA F.

EDWARDS RICK

TRAN RONALD

CALFO PAUL A.

1 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY

4/28/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE CSR: AURORA D. BOWSER/ #12801

3/8/2023: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE CSR: AURORA D. BOWSER/ #12801

Notice - NOTICE OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATE

3/8/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE (SMITH-22STCV18719))

3/8/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE (SMITH-22STCV18719))

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

2/27/2023: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Request for Dismissal

2/16/2023: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: GROUP - (MAUNE RAICHLE HARTLEY FRENCH &...)

2/8/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: GROUP - (MAUNE RAICHLE HARTLEY FRENCH &...)

Substitution of Attorney

1/18/2023: Substitution of Attorney

Notice - NOTICE SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT SCHOLLS WELLNESS COMPANY, LLCS NOTICE OF TAKING HEARING ON ITS MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS OFF CALENDAR

1/13/2023: Notice - NOTICE SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT SCHOLLS WELLNESS COMPANY, LLCS NOTICE OF TAKING HEARING ON ITS MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS OFF CALENDAR

Request for Dismissal

1/12/2023: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

1/12/2023: Request for Dismissal

Objection - PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO THE AFFIDAVIT OF TAD S. YANAGI SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SCHOLLS WELLNESS COMPANY LLC'S MOTION TO QUASH

1/6/2023: Objection - PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO THE AFFIDAVIT OF TAD S. YANAGI SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SCHOLLS WELLNESS COMPANY LLC'S MOTION TO QUASH

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT SCHOLLS WELLNESS COMPANY LLC'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS

1/6/2023: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT SCHOLLS WELLNESS COMPANY LLC'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE (NOT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT) RE PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH

1/6/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE (NOT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT) RE PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH

Declaration - DECLARATION OF PAUL A. CALFO IN SUPPORT OF SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT SCHOLL'S WELLNESS COMPANY, LLC'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS

12/22/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF PAUL A. CALFO IN SUPPORT OF SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT SCHOLL'S WELLNESS COMPANY, LLC'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Motion to Quash Service of Summons - SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT SCHOLL'S WELLNESS COMPANY, LLC'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS

12/22/2022: Motion to Quash Service of Summons - SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT SCHOLL'S WELLNESS COMPANY, LLC'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT SCHOLL'S WELLNESS COMPANY, LLC'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS

12/22/2022: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT SCHOLL'S WELLNESS COMPANY, LLC'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Request for Dismissal

12/20/2022: Request for Dismissal

84 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2024
  • Hearing04/15/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2024
  • Hearing04/02/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2023
  • Hearing08/02/2023 at 1:45 PM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketNotice of Suggestion of Bankruptcy; Filed by: Whittaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore CSR: Aurora D. Bowser/ #12801; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketNotice of Final Status Conference and Trial Date; Filed by: Claudia Ann Smith, (Plaintiff); As to: Avon Products, Inc. (Defendant); Ben NYE Co., Inc. (Defendant); Conopco Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Trial Setting Conference (SMITH-22STCV18719))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Signed and Filed by: Claudia Ann Smith, (Plaintiff); As to: The Procter & Gamble Company Erroneously Sued As The Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name): Filed By: Claudia Ann Smith, (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 02/27/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Claudia Ann Smith, on 06/07/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Claudia Ann Smith, as to JOE BLASCO COSMETICS, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
102 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: JCCP Coordinated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lawrence P. Riff in Department 15 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Asbestos

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Claudia Ann Smith, (Plaintiff); As to: Avon Products, Inc. (Defendant); Ben NYE Co., Inc. (Defendant); Conopco Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Claudia Ann Smith, (Plaintiff); As to: Avon Products, Inc. (Defendant); Ben NYE Co., Inc. (Defendant); Conopco Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Claudia Ann Smith, (Plaintiff); As to: Avon Products, Inc. (Defendant); Ben NYE Co., Inc. (Defendant); Conopco Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less