This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/29/2023 at 09:10:15 (UTC).

CLAUDIA ANN SMITH, VS AVON PRODUCTS, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/07/2022 CLAUDIA ANN SMITH, filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against AVON PRODUCTS, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8719

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SMITH CLAUDIA ANN

Defendants

AVON PRODUCTS INC.

BAYER CONSUMER CARE HOLDINGS LLC FKA BAYER CONSUMER CARE LLC FKA MSD CONSUMER CARE INC. AND BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC A SUBSIDIARY OF BAYER AG

BEN NYE CO. INC.

CONOPCO INC.

COTY INC.

DORSETT & JACKSON INC.

ESTEE LAUDER COMPANIES INC.

FEDERATED DEPARTMENT STORES INC.

LONGS DRUG STORES CALIFORNIA L.L.C.

MACYS INC.

MARY KAY INC.

MAYBELLINE LLC

PFIZER INC.

PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

REVLON INC.

RITE AID CORPORATION

SHULTON INC.

UNILEVER PLC

VANDERBILT MINERALS LLC

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

AMELL DAVID L.

RANCILIO DAVID

Defendant Attorneys

BEAL HOLLY C.

CHANG STEPHANIE C.

CACHAN MANUEL FRANCISCO

SACHS MICHAEL B.

MEDRANO MELISSA M.

STRUNK CHRISTOPHER DANIEL

MEAK VANTHARA

LEWIS SHAWTINA F.

EDWARDS RICK

CALFO PAUL A.

KHARE VIIU SPANGLER

KO SANDRA MEEYOUN

LANGBORD PETER BENNETT

GALDO DOROTHEA S.

GIAQUINTO MICHAEL

GRANT SCOTT S

KAPLAN BRADLEY P.

TRAN RONALD

1 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

6/2/2023: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE OF SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY

4/28/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE CSR: AURORA D. BOWSER/ #12801

3/8/2023: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE CSR: AURORA D. BOWSER/ #12801

Notice - NOTICE OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATE

3/8/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE (SMITH-22STCV18719))

3/8/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE (SMITH-22STCV18719))

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

2/27/2023: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Request for Dismissal

2/16/2023: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: GROUP - (MAUNE RAICHLE HARTLEY FRENCH &...)

2/8/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: GROUP - (MAUNE RAICHLE HARTLEY FRENCH &...)

Substitution of Attorney

1/18/2023: Substitution of Attorney

Notice - NOTICE SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT SCHOLLS WELLNESS COMPANY, LLCS NOTICE OF TAKING HEARING ON ITS MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS OFF CALENDAR

1/13/2023: Notice - NOTICE SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT SCHOLLS WELLNESS COMPANY, LLCS NOTICE OF TAKING HEARING ON ITS MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS OFF CALENDAR

Request for Dismissal

1/12/2023: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

1/12/2023: Request for Dismissal

Objection - PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO THE AFFIDAVIT OF TAD S. YANAGI SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SCHOLLS WELLNESS COMPANY LLC'S MOTION TO QUASH

1/6/2023: Objection - PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO THE AFFIDAVIT OF TAD S. YANAGI SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SCHOLLS WELLNESS COMPANY LLC'S MOTION TO QUASH

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT SCHOLLS WELLNESS COMPANY LLC'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS

1/6/2023: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT SCHOLLS WELLNESS COMPANY LLC'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE (NOT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT) RE PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH

1/6/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE (NOT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT) RE PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH

Declaration - DECLARATION OF PAUL A. CALFO IN SUPPORT OF SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT SCHOLL'S WELLNESS COMPANY, LLC'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS

12/22/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF PAUL A. CALFO IN SUPPORT OF SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT SCHOLL'S WELLNESS COMPANY, LLC'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Motion to Quash Service of Summons - SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT SCHOLL'S WELLNESS COMPANY, LLC'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS

12/22/2022: Motion to Quash Service of Summons - SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT SCHOLL'S WELLNESS COMPANY, LLC'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT SCHOLL'S WELLNESS COMPANY, LLC'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS

12/22/2022: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT SCHOLL'S WELLNESS COMPANY, LLC'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS

85 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

04/15/2024

Hearing04/15/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/02/2024

Hearing04/02/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2023

Hearing08/02/2023 at 1:45 PM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2023

DocketUpdated -- Joe Blasco Cosmetics, Inc. (Doe 1) (Defendant): Organization Name changed from JOE BLASCO COSMETICS, INC. to Joe Blasco Cosmetics, Inc. (Doe 1)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2023

DocketUpdated -- The Procter & Gamble Company Erroneously Sued As The Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Company (Doe 2) (Defendant): Organization Name changed from The Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Company to The Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Company (Doe 2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2023

DocketUpdated -- LOreal USA, Inc.(Doe 3) (Defendant): Organization Name changed from LOREAL USA, INC.(Doe 3) to LOreal USA, Inc.(Doe 3)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2023

DocketUpdated -- Scholls Wellness Company LLC (Doe 4) (Defendant): Organization Name changed from SCHOLLS WELLNESS COMPANY LLC (Doe 4) to Scholls Wellness Company LLC (Doe 4)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2023

DocketUpdated -- Merck & Co., Inc. (Doe 5) (Defendant): Organization Name changed from MERCK & CO., INC. (Doe 5) to Merck & Co., Inc. (Doe 5)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2023

DocketOn the Complaint filed by Claudia Ann Smith, on 06/07/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Claudia Ann Smith, as to Pfizer, Inc.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2023

DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Claudia Ann Smith, (Plaintiff); As to: Pfizer, Inc. (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
109 More Docket Entries
06/22/2022

DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2022

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed Complex

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2022

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: JCCP Coordinated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2022

DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2022

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lawrence P. Riff in Department 15 Spring Street Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2022

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Asbestos

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2022

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Claudia Ann Smith, (Plaintiff); As to: Avon Products, Inc. (Defendant); Ben NYE Co., Inc. (Defendant); Conopco Inc. (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2022

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Claudia Ann Smith, (Plaintiff); As to: Avon Products, Inc. (Defendant); Ben NYE Co., Inc. (Defendant); Conopco Inc. (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2022

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Claudia Ann Smith, (Plaintiff); As to: Avon Products, Inc. (Defendant); Ben NYE Co., Inc. (Defendant); Conopco Inc. (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2022

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less