This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/21/2023 at 03:33:45 (UTC).

CLAUDIA ALVAREZ VS WIRELESS ADVOCATES LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/07/2021 CLAUDIA ALVAREZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against WIRELESS ADVOCATES LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LIA MARTIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1352

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LIA MARTIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALVAREZ CLAUDIA

Defendants

CAR TOYS INC.

MIRANDA CRYSTA

WIRELESS ADVOCATES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ARIAS JANETH

LEONG ANGELA

Defendant Attorney

MEQUET SHARON SOGOMIAN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND DISMISS, OR IN TH...)

8/2/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND DISMISS, OR IN TH...)

Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)

2/27/2023: Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)

Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

2/21/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

Notice of Ruling

2/10/2023: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBIT...)

2/10/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBIT...)

Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

2/9/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

Notice - NOTICE OF SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY RE WIRELESS ADVOCATES LLC, AND AUTOMATIC STAY OF PROCEEDINGS RE WIRELESS ADVOCATES LLC

1/27/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY RE WIRELESS ADVOCATES LLC, AND AUTOMATIC STAY OF PROCEEDINGS RE WIRELESS ADVOCATES LLC

Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING

7/5/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

6/23/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

6/23/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

6/23/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice of Continuance

6/30/2022: Notice of Continuance

Notice of Continuance

6/30/2022: Notice of Continuance

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

7/26/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

7/26/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOAN TOIGO IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

7/30/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOAN TOIGO IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Motion to Compel Arbitration

7/30/2021: Motion to Compel Arbitration

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SHARON MEQUET IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

7/30/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SHARON MEQUET IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2024
  • Hearing03/20/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2024
  • Hearing03/20/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Join Necessary Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2024
  • Hearing03/20/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss, or in the alternative, Stay Proceedings; Filed by Defendant Wireless Advocates, lLC scheduled for 08/02/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 16 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 03/20/2024 09:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to Join Necessary Party in Wireless Advocates, LLC, Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss, or in the Alternative Stay Proceedings; Filed by Defendants Car Toys, Inc. Crysta Miranda; scheduled for 08/02/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 16 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 03/20/2024 09:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/02/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 16 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 03/20/2024 09:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy of Deft. Wireless Advocates, LLC; scheduled for 08/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 16 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 08/02/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss, or in th...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration scheduled for 01/30/2024 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 16 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 03/20/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketNotice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy); Filed by: WIRELESS ADVOCATES LLC (Defendant); As to: Claudia Alvarez (Plaintiff); Bankruptcy Stay Case Type: Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/18/2021 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/18/2021 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lia Martin in Department 16 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Claudia Alvarez (Plaintiff); As to: WIRELESS ADVOCATES LLC (Defendant); CAR TOYS INC. (Defendant); CRYSTA MIRANDA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Claudia Alvarez (Plaintiff); As to: WIRELESS ADVOCATES LLC (Defendant); CAR TOYS INC. (Defendant); CRYSTA MIRANDA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Claudia Alvarez (Plaintiff); As to: WIRELESS ADVOCATES LLC (Defendant); CAR TOYS INC. (Defendant); CRYSTA MIRANDA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Claudia Alvarez (Plaintiff); As to: WIRELESS ADVOCATES LLC (Defendant); CAR TOYS INC. (Defendant); CRYSTA MIRANDA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less