This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/06/2023 at 17:37:13 (UTC).

CLAUDIA ALVARADO, VS CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, LLC , A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/03/2023 CLAUDIA ALVARADO, filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, LLC , A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0087

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALVARADO CLAUDIA

Defendants

CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS HOLDING COMPANY LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS HOLDINGS LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS OPERATING LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PHILLIPS REX J.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/3/2023: Complaint

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/3/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

1/3/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/3/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/3/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/3/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/4/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for

1/5/2023: Certificate of Mailing for

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/5/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

1/5/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2023
  • Hearing06/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 69 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • Hearing04/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 69 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 69

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 69

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Claudia Alvarado, (Plaintiff); As to: Charter Communications, LLC , a limited liability company (Defendant); Charter Communications Operating, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); Charter Communications Holding Company, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William F. Fahey in Department 69 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketAddress for REX J. PHILLIPS (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Claudia Alvarado, (Plaintiff); As to: Charter Communications, LLC , a limited liability company (Defendant); Charter Communications Operating, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); Charter Communications Holding Company, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Claudia Alvarado, (Plaintiff); As to: Charter Communications, LLC , a limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less